Coulter v. Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carleen Coulter
Defendant: Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC, Dufry America, LLC and Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC doing business as Hudson Nonstop
Case Number: 1:2023cv16176
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: LaShonda A Hunt
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Motion hearing held telephonically. Defendants' Combined Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #24 is taken under advisement for ruling by mail. Parties shall submit an agreed proposed briefing schedule on the motion by 1/18/24. Discovery is stayed pending further court order. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss #24 is reset from in-person to telephonic on 1/11/24 at 9:45AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Mailed notice (ags)
January 4, 2024 Filing 25 Defendants' NOTICE of Motion by Moez M. Kaba for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #24 before Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 1/11/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Kaba, Moez)
January 4, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC and Memorandum of Authorities in Support (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sourabh Mishra in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Kaba, Moez)
December 28, 2023 Filing 23 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC by Moez M. Kaba (Kaba, Moez)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Motion by Moez M. Kaba for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hudson Group (HG) Retail; Dufry America, LLC #20 is granted. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21459640. (Kaba, Moez)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge LaShonda A. Hunt. Defendants' response to the complaint remains due by 1/4/24 but the joint status report deadline of 1/8/24 #13 is stricken. A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/11/24, at 9:45 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/8/23.(nsf, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED supplement #15 Defendants' Corrected Supplemental Statement in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corrected Declaration of Brian Quinn in Support of Defendants' Corrected Supplemental Statement)(MISHRA, SOURABH)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC by SOURABH MISHRA (MISHRA, SOURABH)
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Quinn)(Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #11 is granted, and no appearance on the motion is necessary. Defendants' response to the complaint is due 1/4/24. By 1/8/24, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen A. Stetsko for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #11 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/30/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of removal, #1 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 24, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21359671. (MISHRA, SOURABH)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carleen Coulter by Eaghan Seumas Davis (Davis, Eaghan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carleen Coulter by Tyler J. Story (Story, Tyler)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carleen Coulter by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendants shall file a supplement to their notice of removal to clarify the citizenship of defendants. The notice of removal refers to defendants as "incorporated" but also refers to them as LLCs. The citizenship of an LLC is determined by the citizenship of its members. To establish diversity jurisdiction, the party asserting jurisdiction must identify the citizenship of each of the LLC's members (and if those members have members, the citizenship of those members as well). See Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). Defendants' supplement is due 11/30/23. (mss)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC by Kathleen A. Stetsko (Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2023CH08295) filed by Dufry America, LLC, Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21354846. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Stetsko, #2 Declaration of Brian Quinn)(Stetsko, Kathleen)
November 21, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (axa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carleen Coulter
Represented By: Eaghan Seumas Davis
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Tyler J. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dufry America, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: SOURABH MISHRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Group (HG) Retail, LLC doing business as Hudson Nonstop
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: SOURABH MISHRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?