Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd. v. Blockware Mining, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd.
Defendant: Blockware Mining, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv16195
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Joseph B. Evans' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on defendant's behalf #15 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21540148. (Evans, Joseph)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney M. Elias Berman's motion for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Blockware Mining Inc. #13 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21527308. (Berman, M. Elias)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Ariana Deskins' Motion to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21511482. (Pellegrino, Ariana)
January 10, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties' Stipulated Motion to extend time for defendant to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 2/8/2024. Mailed notice (cn).
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Blockware Mining, Inc.STIPULATED MOTION re Deadline for Responsive Pleading (Wolf, Daniel-charles)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blockware Mining, Inc. by Daniel-charles Wolf (Wolf, Daniel-charles)
December 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd. (Hanba, Christopher)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd. as to Blockware Mining, Inc. on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (Hanba, Christopher)
December 10, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Kuan-Hsun Chiu's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on plaintiff's behalf #3 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21398683. (KUAN-HSUN, CHIU)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hanba, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21357316. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Incorporation of Change of Name, #2 Exhibit B - First Colocation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Second Colocation Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Third Colocation Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Compilation of Curtailment Notices)(Hanba, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )
November 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 22, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Blockware Mining, Inc. (jxm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd. v. Blockware Mining, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung Infrastructure Ltd. f/k/a Mamoru Mining Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Edward Hanba
Represented By: Kuan-Hsun Chiu
Represented By: Ariana Deskins Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockware Mining, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel-charles Wolf
Represented By: Joseph B. Evans
Represented By: M. Elias Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?