Flanagan et al v. Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Felecia Flanagan and Nicole Moore
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North and Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore
Case Number: 1:2023cv16209
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' second extension for time to answer or otherwise plead #15 . Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 2/2/2024. This is the final extension. The Court strikes the status date set for 1/16/2024 and resets it to 2/8/2024 at 1:30 PM. The parties should file the initial joint status report by 2/2/2024. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by David K. Haase for presentment of extension of time, #15 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/17/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Haase, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North, Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead and File Joint Status Report (Second Request) (Unopposed) (Haase, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North, Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore by Lillian T. Manning (Manning, Lillian)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 . Defendants' responsive pleadings are due by 1/12/2024. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by David K. Haase for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #10 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/4/2024 at 01:45 PM. (Haase, David)
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North, Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Haase, David)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North, Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore by David K. Haase (Haase, David)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore as to Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Feuer, Adam)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 1/16/2024 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/9/2024. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore as to Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023; Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Feuer, Adam)
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North, Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC, Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore (axa, )
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
November 27, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Two). (lw, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore by Samuel Louis Eirinberg (Eirinberg, Samuel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore by Nick Heath Wooten (Wooten, Nick)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore by Majdi Y. Hijazin (Hijazin, Majdi)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore by Adam J. Feuer (Feuer, Adam)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Felecia Flanagan, Nicole Moore; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21359107. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feuer, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flanagan et al v. Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felecia Flanagan
Represented By: Nick Heath Wooten
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Represented By: Samuel Louis Eirinberg
Represented By: Adam J. Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Moore
Represented By: Nick Heath Wooten
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Represented By: Samuel Louis Eirinberg
Represented By: Adam J. Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC
Represented By: David K. Haase
Represented By: Lillian T. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Chicago Northlake, LLC d/b/a Kindred Hospital Chicago-North
Represented By: David K. Haase
Represented By: Lillian T. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred THC North Shore, LLC d/b/a Kindred-Chicago-Lakeshore
Represented By: David K. Haase
Represented By: Lillian T. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?