Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, TecUnite, Oilmaiy, DaVoice, envisioned, BOOMIBOO Direct and Dema Store
Case Number: 1:2023cv16216
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Filing 42 STATUS Report JOINT by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 (Urbanczyk, Adam)
January 19, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendants Oilmaiy, TecUnite for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for preliminary injunction #12 UNOPPOSED (Keleher, Christopher)
January 17, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 of settlement re: Def. 20 envisioned (Urbanczyk, Adam)
January 17, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to certain Defendants (Swift, Brian)
January 16, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to certain Defendants (Swift, Brian)
January 10, 2024 Filing 43 Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 1:30 PM. (rj, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone motion hearing held on 1/10/2024. Motion to modify asset restraint to be noticed for 1/16/2024. Defendants Tecunite and Oilmaiy's motion for extension of time to challenge motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Unopposed motion of Defendant Boomiboo for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 1/30/2024 #35 is granted. Defendant's motion to dissolve preliminary injunction is due by 1/23/2024; Plaintiff's responses are due by 2/6/2024; and Defendant's replies are due by 2/13/2024. Next telephonic status date set for 4/2/2024 for ruling on the motion to dissolve the preliminary injunction. The next telephonic status date is set for 1/25/2024 at 1:30 p.m. for the default judgment. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 9, 2024 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Paul Keleher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #35 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/16/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Keleher, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant BOOMIBOO Direct for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED (Keleher, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 1/10/2024 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 8, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to certain Defendants (Swift, Brian)
January 3, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Paul Keleher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #31 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/10/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Keleher, Christopher)
January 2, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendants Oilmaiy, TecUnite for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Keleher, Christopher)
December 28, 2023 Filing 30 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to certain Defendants (Swift, Brian)
December 27, 2023 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dema Store by Nicholas S. Lee (Lee, Nicholas)
December 22, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to certain Defendants (Swift, Brian)
December 21, 2023 Filing 26 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/21/2023:Mailed notice(rj, ) (rj, ).
December 21, 2023 Filing 25 letter re: motion to dissolve TRO by envisioned (Gillis, Leslie)
December 20, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant envisionedto dissolve TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in support, #2 Declaration in support)(Rosenbaum, Cory)
December 14, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held. Defendants Tecunite and Oilmaiy's motion to set a briefing schedule #16 #20 are granted. Briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #12 : Defendants' replies are due by 1/5/2024; Plaintiffs' reply is due by 1/12/2024. Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 1:30 PM with joint status report due by 1/19/2024. Plaintiffs to submit a modified Temporary Restraining Order as to the terms stated on the record. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 by Brian Swift (Swift, Brian)
December 14, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant envisioned by Cory Jay Rosenbaum (Rosenbaum, Cory)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant BOOMIBOO Direct to set a briefing schedule to challenge Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Keleher, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BOOMIBOO Direct by Christopher Paul Keleher (Keleher, Christopher)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 as to The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (Urbanczyk, Adam)
December 13, 2023 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant envisioned by Cory Jay Rosenbaum (Rosenbaum, Cory)
December 13, 2023 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (daj, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Oilmaiy, TecUnite to set a briefing schedule to challenge preliminary injunction motion (Keleher, Christopher)
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DaVoice by Casey Ann Hewitt (Hewitt, Casey)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TecUnite, Oilmaiy by Christopher Paul Keleher (Keleher, Christopher)
December 12, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (mcp, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Adam Edward Urbanczyk for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #12 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/14/2023 at 01:45 PM. (Urbanczyk, Adam)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Urbanczyk)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 Sealed Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/30/2023 (td, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #8 , for entry of a temporary restraining order #5 , and for electronic service of process #7 . The Court sets a status date for 12/14/2023 at 1:45 PM. Plaintiff should file any motion for preliminary injunction and notice it for presentment at the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) Modified on 11/30/2023 (rj, ).
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Adam Edward Urbanczyk for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 , motion to seal #8 , motion for temporary restraining order #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/30/2023 at 01:45 PM. (Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 to seal certain documents (Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1, leave for electronic service of process (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Urbanczyk)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 Declaration of Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 for temporary restraining order #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 for temporary restraining order (Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
November 27, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Two). (lw, )
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 24, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Schedule A to the Complaint)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Urbanczyk, Adam)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21359685. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Urbanczyk, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1 v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trademark Rightsholder Identified in Exhibit 1
Represented By: Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Represented By: Brian Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TecUnite
Represented By: Christopher Paul Keleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oilmaiy
Represented By: Christopher Paul Keleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVoice
Represented By: Casey Ann Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: envisioned
Represented By: Cory Jay Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOOMIBOO Direct
Represented By: Christopher Paul Keleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dema Store
Represented By: Nicholas S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?