Kayomi Harai v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Kayomi Harai
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2023cv16222
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 32 ENTER ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/25/2024:Mailed notice (maf)
January 25, 2024 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic ruling on motion hearing held. Motion for default judgment #26 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (maf)
January 25, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Defendant no. 81 chiyunfeikeji (Vogt, Keith)
January 15, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to [Certain] defendants (Vogt, Keith)
December 29, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #26 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/25/2024 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
December 29, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Kayomi Harai in support of motion for default judgment #26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
December 29, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for default judgment as to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against the Defendants Identified in First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith)
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The TRO is extended to 1/25/24 or until further order of the Court and will remain in effect until 1/25/24. Mailed notice(maf)
December 13, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 12/14/23 is re-set to 1/25/24 at 9:00 a.m. re: MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for preliminary injunction #17 . Dial: 1-888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf)
December 6, 2023 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Kayomi Harai. (Document not scanned) (rc, )
December 6, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayomi Harai as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #17 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/14/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Kayomi Harai in support of motion for preliminary injunction #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration)(Vogt, Keith)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/30/2023. (ags)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic ruling on motion hearing held. Motion granted 12 . Telephone Conference set for 12/14/23 at 9:00 a.m. Dial: 1-888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf)
November 30, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (evw, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for leave to file under seal #10 is granted. Motion for leave to file excess pages #11 is granted. Motion 12 will be heard via Telephone Conference set for 11/30/23 at 9:00 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf)
November 27, 2023 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Sealed Exhibit 2, Declaration of Kayomi Harai regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1)(Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in support of 12 Exparte motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-4, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration, #3 Declaration of Kayomi Harai, #4 Exhibit 1, of Kayomi Harai's declaration)(Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kayomi Harai; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21361399. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith)
November 27, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeannice W. Appenteng. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Three). (lw, )
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayomi Harai v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayomi Harai
Represented By: Adam Grodman
Represented By: Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Represented By: Monica Rita Martin
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?