Glebiv v. Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Glebiv
Defendant: Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC d/b/a Rivers Casino
Case Number: 1:2023cv16225
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant shall respond to any amended complaint within thirty days. The Court will set additional dates, including a briefing schedule on any motion to dismiss and a revised status report deadline, in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties to this case and two other cases, Massud v. Midwest Gaming & Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Rivers Casino Des Plaines, Case No. 1:23-cv-16359 (N.D. Ill.) (the "Massud Action"), pending before Judge Pacold, and Vicki Dale and Genevieve Borowski v. Midwest Gaming & Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Rivers Casino Des Plaines, Case No. 1:23-cv-17134 (N.D. Ill.) (the "Dale Action"), pending before Judge Coleman, move to designate these actions as related and consolidate all three cases here for coordinated proceedings. See #10 . Local Rule 40.4 instructs that case are related if they involve the same property, involve some of the same issues, grow out of the same transaction or occurrence, or, in class actions suits, one or more of the classes are the same. These cases fit that bill: the underlying allegations and claims asserted in each of the actions are substantially similar, involve substantially similar issues of fact and law and common defendants, and are predicated upon the same or substantially similar transactions or occurrences. Reassignment is thus proper under the rule if: the cases are pending in this Court (they are); having a single judge handle the cases saves substantial judicial time and effort (it will); this case has not progressed to the point where reassignment will delay these proceedings (it has not); and the cases are susceptible to disposition in a single proceeding (the parties agree that they are). Therefore, this Court, with the consent of Judges Pacold and Coleman, grants the motion for reassignment #10 and hereby refers the Massud and Dale actions (Case Nos. 1:23-cv-16359 and 1:23-cv-17134) to the Executive Committee for reassignment under L.R. 40.4, so that the three cases may be consolidated here. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint by 2/29/24. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC by Maveric Ray Searle (Searle, Maveric)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court strikes the 1/17/24 Notice of Motion date and resets the matter for 1/24/24 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of motion to reassign case,, motion to consolidate cases,, motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC in support of motion to reassign case,, motion to consolidate cases,, motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #10 DEFENDANT'S MEMO IN SUPPORT OF ITS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REASSIGN RELATED CASES, CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES, SET DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S ANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Glebiv Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Dale Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Massud Complaint)(Wolfe, Matthew)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC to reassign case to Reassign Related Cases , MOTION by Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC to consolidate cases to Consolidate Related Cases, Set a Deadline for Filing Consolidated Complaint, and , MOTION by Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC to set a briefing schedule for Defendant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss (Wolfe, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time #6 and orders Defendant to respond to the complaint by 1/29/24. The parties shall also file their initial status report by this date. The Court reminds counsel that all motions must be noticed for presentment. Mailed notice. (kl, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC (Bernstein, Samuel)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (Bernstein, Samuel)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC by Samuel George Bernstein (Bernstein, Samuel)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Glebiv as to Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Klinger, Gary)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 1/19/2024, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at Gloria_Lewis@ilnd.uscourts.gov. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC (axa, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Glebiv; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21361823. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klinger, Gary)
November 27, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Two). (lw, )
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glebiv v. Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Glebiv
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC d/b/a Rivers Casino
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Maveric Ray Searle
Represented By: Samuel George Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?