JP LLC v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: JP LLC and CJ Products LLC
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2023cv16244
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
January 18, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
January 12, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
January 2, 2024 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/2/2024. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 2, 2024 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction is granted #23 . Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The telephonic preliminary injunction hearing set for 1/4/2024 is vacated. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Office Of David Gulbransen is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 3/8/2024 at 8:55 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on 3/1/2024. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 31, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CJ Products LLC, JP LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 26 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CJ Products LLC, JP LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by CJ Products LLC, JP LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiffs CJ Products LLC, JP LLC for preliminary injunction (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP LLC, CJ Products LLC as to Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 12/28/2023, answer due 1/18/2024. (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs CJ Products LLC, JP LLC regarding SEALED Order #13 , sealed document #2 (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CJ Products LLC by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr (Gulbransen, David)
December 28, 2023 NEW PARTIES: CJ Products LLC added to case caption. (Gulbransen, David)
December 24, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JP LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JP LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JP LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for extension of the TRO #15 is granted; the ex parte temporary restraining order entered on 12/4/2023 is extended through 1/4/2024 (Judge Kennelly is not holding court on 1/2/2024 or 1/3/2024). The telephonic preliminary injunction hearing set for 12/18/2023 is vacated and reset to 1/4/2024 at 9:00 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Any motion for preliminary injunction must be filed by 12/28/2023. Any motion for preliminary injunction filed in this case must be accompanied by a certificate stating upon whom and how the motion has been served. (mk)
December 14, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (axk, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff JP LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gulbransen, David)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by CJ Products LLC. (Document not scanned). (jn, )
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 SEALED ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/4/2023. (mma, )
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motions to file under seal #7 #11 and motion to file excess pages #10 are granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order #8 is also granted. Enter Sealed Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic preliminary injunction hearing is set for 12/18/2023 at 8:55 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Any motion for preliminary injunction or motion to extend the TRO must be filed by 12/13/2023. Any motion for preliminary injunction filed in this case must be accompanied by a certificate stating upon whom and how the motion has been served. Mailed notice. (mma, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff JP LLC to seal document sealed document #4 , sealed document #2 , sealed document #5 , sealed document, #9 (Gulbransen, David)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff JP LLC for leave to file excess pages (Gulbransen, David)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff JP LLC Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen (1 of 2), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen (2 of 2), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff JP LLC for temporary restraining order (Gulbransen, David)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff JP LLC to seal document sealed document #4 , sealed document #2 , sealed document #5 (Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JP LLC by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr (Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff JP LLC USPTO Cover Sheet (Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff JP LLC Affiliate Disclosure (Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff JP LLC Complaint, Ex. 1, Ex. 2, and Schedule A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Appendix Schedule A)(Gulbransen, David)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JP LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21363923.(Gulbransen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP LLC v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP LLC
Represented By: David Lee Gulbransen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ Products LLC
Represented By: David Lee Gulbransen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?