MIRACOR MEDICAL SA v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
Plaintiff: MIRACOR MEDICAL SA
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES and THORATEC LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv16257
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #18 ) is granted. Attorney Cahill E. Ronald is added as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 8, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' motion for an extension of time (Dckt. No. #20 ) is hereby granted. The responses to the complaint are due by February 2, 2024. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants ABBOTT LABORATORIES, THORATEC LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 or Otherwise Respond (Raghavan, Saranya)
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21438917. (Ronald, Cahill)
December 14, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' motion for an extension of time (Dckt. No. #15 ) is granted. The responses to the complaint are due by January 19, 2024. Attorney Klein's pro hac vice motion (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. Mailed notice (jjr, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MIRACOR MEDICAL SA by Mark A Hagedorn (Hagedorn, Mark)
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants ABBOTT LABORATORIES, THORATEC LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Raghavan, Saranya)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21416499. (Klein, Charles)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ABBOTT LABORATORIES, THORATEC LLC by Kevin John Boyle (Boyle, Kevin)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ABBOTT LABORATORIES, THORATEC LLC by Saranya Raghavan (Raghavan, Saranya)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by February 27, 2024. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. Nos. #8 and #9 ) are granted. Attorney Lauren Ulrich Baker and Jason M. Zucchi are added as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21395918. (Baker, Lauren)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21381866. (Zucchi, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIRACOR MEDICAL SA as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Vare, Todd)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIRACOR MEDICAL SA as to THORATEC LLC on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Vare, Todd)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). The receiving judge will receive equalization credit. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/29/2023. (axk, )
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm)
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jcm)
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ABBOTT LABORATORIES, THORATEC LLC (axa, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by MIRACOR MEDICAL SA (Vare, Todd)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MIRACOR MEDICAL SA (Vare, Todd)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MIRACOR MEDICAL SA by Todd G. Vare (Vare, Todd)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MIRACOR MEDICAL SA; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21364176. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Vare, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIRACOR MEDICAL SA v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRACOR MEDICAL SA
Represented By: Todd G. Vare
Represented By: Cahill E. Ronald
Represented By: Jason M Zucchi
Represented By: Lauren Ulrich Baker
Represented By: Mark A Hagedorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Represented By: Charles Bennett Klein
Represented By: Kevin John Boyle
Represented By: Saranya Raghavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THORATEC LLC
Represented By: Charles Bennett Klein
Represented By: Kevin John Boyle
Represented By: Saranya Raghavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?