Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2023cv16262
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey I Cummings
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #37 is granted. Defendants No. 1-8, 10-12, 14, 16-18, 20, and 22-29 shall to answer or otherwise plead by 2/13/24. Mailed notice (cc, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto (Fahy, Christopher)
January 23, 2024 Filing 38 RESPONSE by The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Heretoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. for preliminary injunction #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Fahy, Christopher)
January 22, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (UNOPPOSED) (Fahy, Christopher)
January 18, 2024 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: The 1/19/24 tracking status hearing is stricken and will be re-set at a later date. Mailed notice (cc, )
January 17, 2024 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Defendants' unopposed motions for extension of time to file responses to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #29 #33 are granted. Defendant Nos. 1-7, 8, 10-12, 14, 16, 17, 18, 20 and 22-29 shall respond to the motion for preliminary injunction by 1/24/24. Mailed notice (air, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William)
January 10, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto for extension of time For Defendants 8 and 17 in Schedule A to the Complaint TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (UNOPPOSED) (Fahy, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto by Christopher James Fahy Amended to include Defendants 8 and 17 in Schedule A to the Complaint (Fahy, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto for extension of time TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIO #29 (Horowitz, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. by Matthew D. Binder (Binder, Matthew)
January 9, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto for extension of time TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Fahy, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto by Christopher James Fahy Defendants 1-7, 10-12, 14, 16, 18, 20, and 22-29 in Schedule A to the Complaint. (Fahy, Christopher)
January 2, 2024 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Deepa A. Chari regarding order on motion for preliminary injunction,,,,, text entry,,,, #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chari, Deepa)
January 2, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepa A. Chari, #2 Exhibit A)(Chari, Deepa)
January 2, 2024 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Before the Court is plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #21 . In connection with that motion, plaintiff must serve all remaining defendants with the following statement: "The Court has taken the motion for a preliminary injunction under advisement and will consider the motion unopposed if no defendant appears and objects by or before January 10, 2024." If no objections are filed by that date, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. Plaintiff must serve this minute order upon all remaining defendants within one business day of its entry on the docket and must promptly file proof of that service. For the reasons stated in the Court's order entering the TRO, the TRO is extended to and including the date upon which the Court adjudicates the motion for a preliminary injunction. See H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 843-45 (7th Cir. 2012). Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under Fed.R.Civ.P. 65(b), this extension "becomes in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." Id. at 844. Mailed notice (ec)
December 29, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto (mek)
December 28, 2023 Filing 24 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Deepa A. Chari regarding motion for preliminary injunction #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chari, Deepa)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #21 (Horowitz, Steven)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Steven)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (daj, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order 17 is granted. The previously entered TRO #12 is extended to 1/2/24. The 12/29/23 tracker status hearing is stricken and re-set to 1/19/24 at 9:00 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). Mailed notice (cc, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in support of Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order (Horowitz, Steven)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Plaintiff's motion to unseal documents #15 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to unseal docket entries #5 , #9 , #10 , and #12 and all of the attached exhibits. Mailed notice (cc, )
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. to unseal document (Horowitz, Steven)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. by Deepa Arundati Chari (Chari, Deepa)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 REGISTRY DEPOSIT INFORMATION FORM by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. (daj, )
December 12, 2023 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 cashier's check, Receipt No. 100000168, posted by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. (lm, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings on 12/5/2023. Mailed notice(mjc, ) Modified on 12/21/2023 (daj, ).
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Jeffrey I. Cummings. Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #4 #8 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #9 , including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and electronic service of process, are granted. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, plaintiff may file under seal the documents identified in the motions to seal. The Temporary Restraining Order being entered along with this minute order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, plaintiff's filings support proceeding on an ex parte basis at this time. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, the Court finds that it is likely that their assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Status hearing is set for 12/29/23 at 9:00 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. Memorandum in support of its ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tim Wei, #2 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 12/21/2023 (daj, ).
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 12/21/2023 (daj, ).
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. to seal (Motion for leave to file motion for temporary restraining order and supporting papers under seal) (Horowitz, Steven)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #6 (Redacted Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tim Wei, #2 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Horowitz, Steven)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. for temporary restraining order (Redacted Version) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Steven)
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. Sealed Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 12/21/2023 (daj, ).
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. to seal (Horowitz, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. (Horowitz, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. by Steven Joseph Horowitz (Horowitz, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (REDACTED) filed by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21364655. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horowitz, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Joseph Horowitz
Represented By: Deepa Arundati Chari
Represented By: Matthew D. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A Hereto
Represented By: Christopher James Fahy
Represented By: William W. Flachsbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?