North Haven Lodging Partners LLC et al v. McMann Commercial Lending LLC et al
Plaintiff: North Haven Lodging Partners LLC and Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC
Defendant: McMann Commercial Lending LLC, McMann Capital and Genie Investments NV
Case Number: 1:2023cv16264
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE by North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLCin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC for temporary restraining order and Injunctive Relief and Hearing on Preliminary Injunction #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/28/23 Transcript, #2 Declaration of Shailesh Patel)(McKenna, William)
January 12, 2024 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: In view of the briefing schedule set for the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #10 #20 , the status hearing set for 1/19/24 is reset for 1/31/2024 at 9:30 A.M. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice. (exr, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by North Haven Lodging Partners LLC and Amended Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (McKenna, William)
January 11, 2024 Filing 24 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC and Amended Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (McKenna, William)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by McMann Capital, McMann Commercial Lending LLC in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Klapman, Daniel)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Genie Investments NV in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Hughes)(Walker, Adam)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: In-person motion hearing held on 12/28/2023. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court enters the following agreed briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order #10 : Defendants' responses are due on or before 1/10/2024, and Plaintiffs' reply is due on or before 1/17/2024. As part of this briefing, each party that is an LLC or LLP must identify the name and domicile(s) of every partner or member of each such entity. See Belleville Catering Co. v. Champaign Market Place LLC, 350 F.3d 691 (7th Cir. 2003); Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729 (7th Cir. 1998). If any partners or members are themselves partnerships or LLCs, this requirement also applies to their partners or members. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/26/2024. A status hearing for tracking purposes is set for 1/19/2024 at 9:00 AM. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: A hearing on the pending motion #10 seeking a temporary restraining order is set for Thursday, 12/28/2023, at 11:00 a.m. That hearing will be held in person in Courtroom 2125 of the Everett McKinley Dirksen United States Courthouse. Briefing on the TRO motion is suspended pending further order. Counsel should instead be prepared to address the substance of the motion at the hearing. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Genie Investments NV by Adam B. Walker (Walker, Adam)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Defendant McMann Capital to statement #14 (Klapman, Daniel)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McMann Capital by Daniel S Klapman (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Klapman, Daniel)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Attorney Adam B. Walker is added as counsel for Genie Investments NV. Mailed notice (ags)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 Regarding Briefing Schedule re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief and Hearing on Preliminary Injunction STATEMENT by North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC (McKenna, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Preet Patel regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 , motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McKenna, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Shailesh Patel regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 , motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(McKenna, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #10 (McKenna, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC for temporary restraining order and Injunctive Relief and Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, William)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21424180. (Walker, Adam)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC, North Haven Lodging Partners LLC as to Genie Investments NV on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (McClain, Andrew)
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC, North Haven Lodging Partners LLC as to McMann Capital on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/1/2024; McMann Commercial Lending LLC on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (McClain, Andrew)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 11/28/2023: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 2/8/2024 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Genie Investments NV, McMann Commercial Lending LLC (axa, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC by Andrew Thomas McClain (McClain, Andrew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs North Haven Lodging Partners LLC, Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC by William J. McKenna, Jr (McKenna, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC (McKenna, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by North Haven Lodging Partners LLC (McKenna, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC, North Haven Lodging Partners LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21364758. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - North Haven BELOC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Wallingford BELOC, #4 Exhibit 3 - Termination Notices, #5 Exhibit 4 (Part I) - Demand to Genie Investments, #6 Exhibit 4 (Part II) - Demand to Genie Investments, #7 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence)(McKenna, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Haven Lodging Partners LLC et al v. McMann Commercial Lending LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Haven Lodging Partners LLC
Represented By: Andrew Thomas McClain
Represented By: William J. McKenna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallingford Lodging Partners LLC
Represented By: Andrew Thomas McClain
Represented By: William J. McKenna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMann Commercial Lending LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMann Capital
Represented By: Daniel S Klapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genie Investments NV
Represented By: Adam B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?