15-09-321 v. INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS and RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2023cv16266
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #13 ) is granted. Attorney Chloe S Booth is added as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21488388. All Defendants (Booth, Chloe)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 26, 2023 Filing 12 FINDING OF RELATEDNESS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.4: In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4 of this Court, I find the above captioned case, presently pending on the calendar of Judge Martha Pacold to be related to 1 :22-cv-05054 which is pending on my calendar. Accordingly, I request that the Executive Committee order said case to be reassigned to my calendar as a related case. Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/2023. (daj, )
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Michael Menapace's corrected motion for leave to file pro hac vice on behalf of all defendants #9 is granted. Michael Menapace's separate motion for leave to file pro hac vice on behalf of only defendant Zurich American Insurance Company #8 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/22/2023. Mailed notice(gcy, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOISCorrected PHV M. Menapace Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21438797 (Menapace, Michael)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21438797. (Menapace, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time for defendants to answer or otherwise plead #5 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/8/2024. The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 1/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Tone, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS for extension of time AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Tone, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS by Jeffrey R. Tone (Tone, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SERIES 15-09-321 by Stephen J. Raab (Raab, Stephen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Raab, Stephen)
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY, EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS (mek,)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SERIES 15-09-321; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21364943.(Raab, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 15-09-321 v. INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Mark E Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Michael Menapace, Mr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Represented By: Michael Menapace, Mr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RURAL COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Chloe S Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?