Roblox Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Roblox Corporation
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto, car ornament world, Grab Sunshine and rosewi
Case Number: 1:2023cv16267
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 NEW PARTIES: car ornament world, Grab Sunshine and rosewi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William)
January 16, 2024 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/16/2024. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #26 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the court's docket within three business days. Instructions on how to do so may be located on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roblox Corporation as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #26 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/16/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #26 (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Roblox Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #26 (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (ksr, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #22 is granted, and no appearance on 1/4/23 is necessary. The TRO is extended to 1/9/24. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of extension of time #22 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/4/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Filing 21 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Roblox Corporation. (Document not scanned) (ph, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 20 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/12/2023. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: No appearance on 12/13/23 is necessary. Plaintiff's ex parte motion to seal #6 is granted. The motions for a temporary restraining order, asset restraint, expedited discovery, electronic service of process, and excess pages #14 #15 is granted. The plaintiff's written submissions establish that if defendants were informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, assets would likely be redirected, defeating plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping the infringement, and obtaining an accounting. The submitted evidence establishes a likelihood of success on the merits, the harm to plaintiff is irreparable and an injunction is in the public interest because infringement interferes with the plaintiff's ability to control its intellectual property. Those rights cannot be fully compensated by money damages. There is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it is an effective, perhaps the most effective, way to communicate with defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and implement the asset freeze. If any defendant were to appear and object, the court will take a fresh look at the asset freeze, and personal jurisdiction. A $10,000 bond or security is sufficient to secure the injunctive relief. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #14 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/13/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Roblox Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation Exhibit 3 to Bayley Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Roblox Corporation in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #14 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bayley Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Roblox Corporation against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (axk, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (axk, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Roblox Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roblox Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21365307. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roblox Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roblox Corporation
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: car ornament world
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grab Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rosewi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?