Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Laborforce, LLC
Plaintiff: Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund and Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan
Defendant: Laborforce, LLC, M & K Employee Services, Inc. and M & K Quality Truck Sales of Summit, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv16272
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: LaShonda A Hunt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 First AMENDED complaint by Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan against Laborforce, LLC, M & K Employee Services, Inc., M & K Quality Truck Sales of Summit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CBA (10.1.2020 to 9.30.2027), #2 Exhibit 2 - 401(k) Plan's Collection Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Participation Agreement with Welfare Fund.pdf, #4 Exhibit 4 - Welfare Fund's Collection Policy, #5 Exhibit 5 - Laborforce's letter to Union 7.07.23, #6 Exhibit 6 - Laborforce's letter to Welfare Fund 7.07.23, #7 Exhibit 7 - Laborforce's Letter to Welfare Fund 10.03.23, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter to Vogel re Laborforce Summit - 10.5.2023)(Krol, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint #16 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their First Amended Complaint separately on the docket. Based on Plaintiffs' representation that Defendant Laborforce, LLC's counsel intends to represent the new proposed Defendants and has agreed to a responsive pleading deadline, responses to the forthcoming First Amended Complaint are due by 2/23/24. In light of the relief entered in this order, the 1/30/24 initial joint status report deadline and 2/6/24 telephonic status hearing #6 are stricken and reset as follows. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Initial Status Report for New Case by 3/6/24. A template for the report can be found on Judge Hunt's webpage under "Initial Status Conference and Status Report." A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 3/21/24, at 9:45 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. No appearance is necessary on 1/30/24. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Allen Krol for presentment of motion for leave to file, #16 before Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 1/30/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Krol, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiffs Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint with Red Line Proposed Revisions)(Krol, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Laborforce, LLC (Vogel, Donald)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Laborforce, LLC(Vogel, Donald)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laborforce, LLC by Martin Wolf O'connor (O'connor, Martin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laborforce, LLC by Sara L Pettinger (Pettinger, Sara)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint #9 is granted, Defendant's response to the complaint is due by 1/11/24. Parties are reminded that all motions must be noticed for presentment in accordance with Judge Hunt's case management procedures. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Laborforce, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,,, #1 (UNOPPOSED MOTION) (Vogel, Donald)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laborforce, LLC by Donald Joseph Vogel (Vogel, Donald)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan as to Laborforce, LLC on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Krol, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge LaShonda A. Hunt. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Initial Status Report for New Case by 1/30/24. A template for the report can be found on Judge Hunt's webpage on the Court's website under "New and Reassigned Cases." A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 2/6/24, at 9:30 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan by William M. Blumthal, Jr (Blumthal, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan (Krol, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan by Jeffrey Allen Krol (Krol, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krol, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund, Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21365787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - CBA (10.1.2020 to 9.30.2027), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 401(k) Plan's Collection Policy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Participation Agreement with Welfare Fund, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Welfare and Pension Funds' Collection Policy, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Laborforce's letter to Union 7.07.23, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Laborforce's letter to Welfare Fund 7.07.23, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Laborforce's letter to Welfare Fund 10.03.23, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Letter to Vogel re Laborforce Summit 10.05.2023)(Krol, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Laborforce, LLC (mek,)
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (mcp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Laborforce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automobile Mechanics' Local No. 701 Union and Industry Welfare Fund
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanics' Local 701 Defined Contribution 401(k) Plan
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborforce, LLC
Represented By: Donald Joseph Vogel
Represented By: Martin Wolf O'connor
Represented By: Sara L Pettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & K Employee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & K Quality Truck Sales of Summit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?