Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Bolton et al
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund and Charles A. Whobrey
Defendant: Antonio A. Bolton, Corey C. Cartwright and Law Offices of Corey C. Cartwright, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2023cv16283
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held on 1/25/2024. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss #11 is denied without prejudice. Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 9:30 AM. The Court notes that Mr. Corey C. Cartwright did not file an appearance on behalf of himself or any other party in this action. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey (Anthaney, Cara)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles A. Whobrey to dismiss. (gcy, )
January 16, 2024 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Antonio A. Bolton. (ksr, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Rebecca Kate McMahon (McMahon, Rebecca)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Corey C. Cartwright on 12/21/2023, answer due 1/11/2024. (Anthaney, Cara)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 21, 2023 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Corey C. Cartwright. (mcp, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Law Offices of Corey C. Cartwright, P.A. on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (Anthaney, Cara)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference is set for 1/25/2024 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/18/2024. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 30, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Antonio A. Bolton, Corey C. Cartwright, Law Offices of Corey C. Cartwright, P.A. (evw, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Anthaney, Cara)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Lois J. Yu (Yu, Lois)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Cara Marie Anthaney (Anthaney, Cara)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Anthaney, Cara)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund, Charles A. Whobrey; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21366464. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Anthaney, Cara)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (mcp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Bolton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Lois J. Yu
Represented By: Cara Marie Anthaney
Represented By: Rebecca Kate McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey
Represented By: Lois J. Yu
Represented By: Cara Marie Anthaney
Represented By: Rebecca Kate McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio A. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey C. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Corey C. Cartwright, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?