McDonald's Corporation et al v. Homeland Insurance Company of New York et al
Plaintiff: McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's USA LLC
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York and AmGuard Insurance Compamy
Case Number: 1:2023cv16297
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: LaShonda A Hunt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: The Court has reviewed the parties' initial joint status report #18 indicating that each plan to file motions for summary judgment. The initial status hearing date of 1/30/24 stands. Parties should be prepared to discuss any initial discovery needs and a proposed dispositive motion schedule. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS Report Joint by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA LLC (Block, Bradley)
January 5, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AmGuard Insurance Compamy(Bruen, Richard)
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Defendant Amguard Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading #11 is granted. Defendant Amguard Insurance Company's response to the complaint is due by 1/5/24. Counsel is reminded that all motions must be noticed for presentment before Judge Hunt in accordance with her case management procedures. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York(Brown, David)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Homeland Insurance Company of New York (Brown, David)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant AmGuard Insurance Compamy for disclosure of Corporate Interests (Bruen, Richard)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant AmGuard Insurance Compamy for extension of time to file answer (Bruen, Richard)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AmGuard Insurance Compamy by Richard F. Bruen, Jr (Bruen, Richard)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Homeland Insurance Company of New York by Stephen Gerald Koo Luehrs (Luehrs, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Homeland Insurance Company of New York by David Thomas Brown (Brown, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA LLC regarding AmGUARD Insurance Company served on Shelly Senghas on 11/30/2023 (Block, Bradley)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA LLC regarding Summons and Complaint served on Homeland Insurance Company of New York on 11/30/2023 (Block, Bradley)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge LaShonda A. Hunt. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Initial Status Report for New Case by 1/23/24. A template for the report can be found on Judge Hunt's webpage on the Court's website under "New and Reassigned Cases." A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/30/24 at 9:30 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
November 29, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AmGuard Insurance Compamy, Homeland Insurance Company of New York (jcm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Block, Bradley)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA LLC by Bradley Stephen Block (Block, Bradley)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Block, Bradley)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA LLC; Jury Demanded. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21367403.(Block, Bradley)
November 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (jcm)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald's Corporation et al v. Homeland Insurance Company of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald's USA LLC
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: David Thomas Brown
Represented By: Stephen Gerald Koo Luehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Compamy
Represented By: Richard F. Bruen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?