Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Henry Howard Services, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund and Charles A. Whobrey
Defendant: Henry Howard Services, L.L.C. and Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv16392
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC's uncontested motion for an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiffs' complaint and to reset the initial conference #14 is granted. Defendant Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by 2/15/2024. Telephonic initial status hearing set for 2/1/2024 is stricken and reset for 2/29/2024 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (lma, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Hardy, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC (Hardy, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC by Thomas Charles Hardy (Hardy, Thomas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Henry Howard Services, L.L.C. on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024. (Buyers, Brandon)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024. (Buyers, Brandon)
January 2, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Henry Howard Services, L.L.C. (two locations), Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC (two locations) (lm, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 2/1/2024 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Brad R. Berliner (Berliner, Brad)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Andrew James Herink (Herink, Andrew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (Buyers, Brandon)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Cara Marie Anthaney (Anthaney, Cara)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Brandon Andrew Buyers (Buyers, Brandon)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buyers, Brandon)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21378513.(Buyers, Brandon)
November 30, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (axa, )
November 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Henry Howard Services, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Represented By: Andrew James Herink
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Cara Marie Anthaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Represented By: Andrew James Herink
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Cara Marie Anthaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Howard Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scorpion Tank Trucks LLC
Represented By: Thomas Charles Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?