Harris et al v. W6LS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris and Donita Olds
Defendant: W6LS, Inc. doing business as WithU doing business as WithU Loans, Caliber Financial Services, Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv16429
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lindsay C Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Harris, Donita Olds as to W6LS, Inc. on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Clark, Dulijaza)
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Attorney Matthew Goldstein's motion to withdraw #9 is granted. Attorney Matthew Goldstein no longer assigned to this case. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION by Attorney Matthew J. Goldstein to withdraw as attorney for Joshua Harris, Donita Olds. No party information provided (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 First AMENDED complaint by Joshua Harris, Donita Olds against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Edelman, Daniel)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: In person initial status hearing set for February 13, 2024 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Initial Status Report shall be filed by February 6, 2024. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, "District Judges", to "Judge Lindsay Jenkins", to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures"). The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. If you need to appear virtually, contact Judge Jenkins' courtroom deputy at least three business days in advance of the hearing to make the request. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 4, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Caliber Financial Services, Inc., W6LS, Inc. (smb, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joshua Harris, Donita Olds by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joshua Harris, Donita Olds by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joshua Harris, Donita Olds by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Joshua Harris, Donita Olds; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21382677. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Edelman, Daniel)
December 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm)
December 1, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. W6LS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donita Olds
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W6LS, Inc. doing business as WithU doing business as WithU Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?