Robledo v. The Bantry Group Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Robledo
Defendant: The Bantry Group Corporation a corporation, individually doing business as Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Wexford Health Sources, Inc., George Duncan, Bonnie Smith, Kimberly Danner, Chelsey Davis, Patricia Smith and Katie Hackney
Case Number: 1:2023cv16483
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patricia Smith. Patricia Smith waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Tengesdal, Robert)
February 1, 2024 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Patricia Smith by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
February 1, 2024 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Patricia Smith by Christopher John Garavaglia (Garavaglia, Christopher)
February 1, 2024 Filing 26 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/1/2024. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants unopposed motion for qualified protective order pursuant to HIPAA #21 is granted. Enter HIPAA Qualified Protective Order. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher John Garavaglia for presentment of motion for order, #23 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/7/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 31, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Kimberly Danner, George Duncan, Bonnie Smith, The Bantry Group Corporation, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. for order Directing Plaintiff to Produce Records Necessary for Responsive Pleadings & a Rule 6 Request for a Short Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 29, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher John Garavaglia for presentment of motion for protective order, #21 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/1/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Kimberly Danner, George Duncan, Bonnie Smith, The Bantry Group Corporation, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. for protective order Pursuant to HIPAA (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order)(Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kimberly Danner, Bonnie Smith by Christopher John Garavaglia (Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kimberly Danner, Bonnie Smith by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bonnie Smith. Bonnie Smith waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kimberly Danner. Kimberly Danner waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. for unopposed motion for extension of time to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's complaint #13 is granted to 2/5/2024. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher John Garavaglia for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/28/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Bantry Group Corporation. The Bantry Group Corporation waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by George Duncan. George Duncan waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Bantry Group Corporation by Christopher John Garavaglia (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants George Duncan, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Christopher John Garavaglia (Garavaglia, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Bantry Group Corporation by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants George Duncan, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference is set for 3/18/2024 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 3/11/2024. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (pmh)
December 6, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants KIMBERLY DANNER, CHELSEY DAVIS, GEORGE DUNCAN, KATIE HACKNEY, BONNIE SMITH, PATRICIA SMITH, THE BANTRY GROUP CORPORATION, a corporation, individually, and d/b/a WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., a corporation (gmm, )
December 5, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, )
December 5, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (evw, )
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Robledo by Michael James Baron (Baron, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Robledo by Cindy Gale Fluxgold (Fluxgold, Cindy)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Robledo by Lorenzo Valladolid (Valladolid, Lorenzo)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Valladolid, Lorenzo)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jorge Robledo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BILNDC-21389673. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 2-622 affidavit, #2 Supplement 2-622 report)(Valladolid, Lorenzo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robledo v. The Bantry Group Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Robledo
Represented By: Michael James Baron
Represented By: Cindy Gale Fluxgold
Represented By: Lorenzo Valladolid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bantry Group Corporation a corporation, individually doing business as Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Duncan
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Smith
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Danner
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Smith
Represented By: Christopher John Garavaglia
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?