Carina Ventures LLC v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carina Ventures LLC, Burford Capital Ltd., Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, Seeger & Weiss LLP, Agri Stats Omega Holding Co. LP, Miller, Canfield, Paddock & Stone, PLC, Hogan Lovells US LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Eimer Stahl LLP, Carpenter Lipps LLP, Dentons US LLP, Vinson & Elkins LLP, Vedder Price, P.C., Jordan, Price, Wall, Gray, Jones & Carlton, PLLC, Venable LLP, Falkenberg Ives LLP, Manning Fulton & Skinner, PA, Clausen Miller P.C., Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider, Lipe, Lyons, Murphy, Nahrstadt & Pontikis, House of Raeford, Baker & McKenzie LLP, Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, L.L.P., Foster Group Acquisition LLC, Foster Group Parent LLC, ACR Foster Intermediate Group LLC, ACR Group Foster Holdings LLC, ACR III Foster Holdings LLC, ACR IV Foster Holdings LLC, Everest National Insurance Company, Houston Specialty Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, RSUI Indemnity Company, ANV Global Services, Inc., Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Marsha K. Prestage, Ronald W. Prestage, Scott J. Prestage, John L. Prestage, Ron Prestage Family Trust, Scott Prestage Family Trust, Hormel Foods, JOTS, Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Axinn, Veltrop, & Harkrider LLP, BB Kansas Holdings, Inc., Maxwell Farms, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Maxwell Farms of Indiana, Inc., Colin R. Kass and Proskauer & Rose LLP
Defendant: Cargill Protein North America, Agri Stats Inc., Express Markets Inc., Butterball LLC, Cargill Inc, Cooper Farms, Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Perdue Farms Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Tyson Foods Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and The Hillshire Brands Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv16948
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 143 STATUS Report by Carina Ventures LLC (Gant, Scott)
January 31, 2024 Filing 142 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/31/24.(nsf, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 141 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Perdue Farms Inc., Perdue Foods LLC(Foley, Danielle)
January 30, 2024 Filing 140 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Cargill Inc, Cargill Protein North America(Miller, Britt)
January 30, 2024 Filing 139 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
January 30, 2024 Filing 138 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Answer and Defenses to Carina Amended Complaint by Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms(Zarlenga, Carmine)
January 30, 2024 Filing 137 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. by Jordan Tank (Tank, Jordan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 136 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cooper Farms, Inc.(Goldberg, Joshua)
January 30, 2024 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farbest Foods, Inc.(Wallstein, Adam)
January 30, 2024 Filing 134 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Butterball LLC Answer and Defenses to Carina Ventures' Amended Class Action Complaint (Kass, Colin)
January 30, 2024 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint) by Agri Stats Inc.(Monts, William)
January 30, 2024 Filing 132 Public (Redacted) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Defenses to Carina Ventures' Amended Complaint by Butterball LLC(Kass, Colin)
January 30, 2024 Filing 131 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Amended Complaint by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc.(Coleman, Craig)
January 30, 2024 Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Colin R. Kass for presentment of (Kass, Colin)
January 30, 2024 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer and Defenses to Amended Complaint) by House of Raeford Farms, Inc.(Wrobel, Gregory)
January 30, 2024 Filing 128 MOTION by Defendant Butterball LLC to seal document Butterball's Answer and Defenses to Carina Ventures' Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin)
January 30, 2024 Filing 127 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Butterball LLC by Todd J. Ohlms (Ohlms, Todd)
January 30, 2024 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc.(Johnston, Daniel)
January 30, 2024 Filing 125 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc. by Daniel Patrick Johnston (Johnston, Daniel)
January 30, 2024 Filing 124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooper Farms, Inc. by Joshua Goldberg (Goldberg, Joshua)
January 30, 2024 Filing 123 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant House of Raeford Farms, Inc. by Gregory Gene Wrobel (Wrobel, Gregory)
January 26, 2024 Filing 122 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats Inc., Butterball LLC, Cargill Inc, Cargill Protein North America, Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Craig)
January 18, 2024 Filing 121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answers to Direct Action Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #119 . Defendants shall file an answer or other pleading on or before 01/30/2024. Emailed notice (axc).
January 17, 2024 Filing 120 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Carina Ventures LLC (Gant, Scott)
January 16, 2024 Filing 119 MOTION by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answers to Direct Action Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Coleman, Craig)
December 28, 2023 Filing 118 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 02/19/2024 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report." The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Finally, the Court notes that this case is substantially related to case no. 19-cv-8313 which is pending before Judge Virginia Kendall. If the parties believe that this case should be reassigned as related to case no. 19-cv-8313, the parties are directed to file a motion to reassign as related in the lowest numbered case. Emailed notice (axc).
December 20, 2023 Filing 116 RECEIVED from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:23-cv-02685. (ph, )
December 19, 2023 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division; granting #64 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case terminated on December 15, 2023.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
December 15, 2023 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. MOTION HEARING held on 12/15/2023. The Court held a motion hearing. Defendants motion to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division Dkt. #64 is GRANTED. Appearances: Colleen A. Harrison, Scott E Gant, Stephen Chuk, Rachel Lamorte, Catherine Medvene, Alexander Burch, Jill Spiker, Leslie Barry, Craig Coleman, Alexander D Burch, H. Weldon Jones, III, Danielle R. Foley, William S. Cherry, III, Allison M Vissichelli, Olga Fleysh.(ERO: yes), filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 113 NOTICE of Setting re: #64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2023 at 12:15 PM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
December 1, 2023 Filing 112 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Carina Ventures LLC.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE and MOTION HEARING held on 11/30/2023 re: #105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. The Court gave Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 8, 2023. The parties will continue conducting discovery and preparing the case for trial while Defendants motion to transfer the case to the Northern District of Illinois is pending. Appearances: Colleen A. Harrison, Jennifer R Scullion, Scott E. Gant, Britt M Miller, Jill Spiker, Gaspare J. Bono, Leslie Barry, Craig Coleman, Danielle R. Foley, William S. Cherry, III, Allison M Vissichelli. Stephen Chuk. (ERO: yes), filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Joint MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference. (Initial Conference reset for 1/3/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 109 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Joint Motion to Continue Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference by Hormel Foods Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2023. (Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Filing 108 NOTICE of Setting re: #105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2023 at 11:00 AM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 107 NOTICE by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
October 16, 2023 Filing 106 RESPONSE to #105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coleman, Craig) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Filing 105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline from Original Complaint)(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 104 REPLY in Support of #64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois, filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to #64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois, filed by Carina Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Agri Stats, Inc. served on 7/25/2023; Express Markets Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Hillshire Brands Company served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to House of Raeford Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hormel Foods Corporation served on 7/25/2023; Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Perdue Foods LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Perdue Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 93 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cooper Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Farbest Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Foster Poultry Farms served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Foster Farms LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cargill, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Butterball, LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Oral Pottinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Butterball, LLC, filed.(Ondeck, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 23, 2023 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed.(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Christopher E. Ondeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Colin Kass to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Oral Pottinger (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30394382) by Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2023. (Gray, Kathryne) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Henry W Jones, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #65 Motion for H. Weldon Jones, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed.(Fales, Lisa) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed.(Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher E. Ondeck (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30388786) by Butterball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Ondeck, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Colin R. Kass (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30388771) by Butterball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Kass, Colin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed.(Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., filed.(Miller, Britt) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., filed.(Cherry, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms identifying Foster Group Acquisition LLC, Foster Group Parent LLC, ACR Foster Intermediate Group LLC, ACR Group Foster Holdings LLC, ACR III Foster Holdings LLC, ACR IV Foster Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gray, Kathryne) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Henry W. Jones, Jr. (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30380272) by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for H. Weldon Jones, III (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30380147) by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Allison Vissichelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Kenina Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Rache Adcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Lindsey Strang Aberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed.(Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed.(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed.(Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allison M. Vissichelli (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376901) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey Strang Aberg (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376874) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenina J. Lee (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376842) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel J. Adcox (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376776) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376388) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for William Cherry III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for William Cherry III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 17, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William S. Cherry III (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30371644) by Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2023. (Cherry, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 17, 2023 The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Craig S. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Paul Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Lisa Jose Fales to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Danielle R. Foley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Andrew T. Hernacki to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Kristin M. Koger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Britt M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed.(Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig S. Coleman (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30351652) by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Coleman, Craig) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Feinstein (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350510) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Jose Fales (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350459) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle R. Foley (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350400) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew T. Hernacki (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350228) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristin M. Koger (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number CTXSDC-30349998) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britt M. Miller (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30347112) by Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Miller, Britt) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Adam Wallstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Gaspare Bono to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leslie Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Emily Chow to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Jill Spiker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding #21 Stipulation and Agreement. (1) Defendants shall file their motion to transfer venue on or before August 18, 2023; (2) Plaintiff will file any response to Defendants motion to transfer venue on or before September 15, 2023; (3) Defendants will file their reply in support of their motion to transfer venue on or before September 29, 2023; (4) Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby stayed and extended until thirty (30) days after the Court has issued its decision on Defendants motion to transfer venue. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) Text Modified on 8/14/2023 (bthomas, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hormel Foods Corporation, filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie A. Barry (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30344134) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Barry, Leslie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gaspare J. Bono (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30344105) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam J. Wallstein (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number CTXSDC-30343846) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Wallstein, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION re: Stipulation and Agreement among the parties by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Carpenter Lipps LLP, Clausen Miller PC, Cooper Farms, Inc., Dentons US LLP, Eimer Stahl LLP, Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Greene Espel PLLP, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jill Rogers Spiker (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30341542) by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 19 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily S. Chow (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30340919) by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2023. (Chow, Emily) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 9, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carina Ventures LLC, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Colleen A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Sarah L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jennifer R. Scullion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Michael S. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carina Ventures LLC, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Sarah L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Jennifer R. Scullion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Colleen A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Michael S. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30240540) filed by Carina Ventures LLC.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carina Ventures LLC v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein North America
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats Inc.
Represented By: Bruce D. Oakley
Represented By: William L Monts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Markets Inc.
Represented By: Bruce D. Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Represented By: Christopher E Ondeck
Represented By: Todd J. Ohlms
Represented By: Colin R. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Inc
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jill Rogers Spiker
Represented By: Joshua Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farbest Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Gaspare Joseph Bono
Represented By: Leslie A. Barry
Represented By: Adam Joseph Wallstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Farms, LLC
Represented By: Carmine R. Zarlenga
Represented By: Kathryne Marie Gray
Represented By: Oral Pottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms
Represented By: Oral Pottinger
Represented By: Carmine R. Zarlenga
Represented By: Kathryne Marie Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Craig Stuart Coleman
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Craig Stuart Coleman
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Raeford Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander D Burch
Represented By: H. Weldon Jones, III
Represented By: Henry W. Jones, Junio
Represented By: Gregory Gene Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Farms Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Represented By: Danielle R Foley
Represented By: Kristin M. Koger
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Paul Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Foods LLC
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Represented By: Danielle R Foley
Represented By: Kristin M. Koger
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Paul Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestage Farms, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Cherry, III
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestage Foods, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Cherry, III
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC
Represented By: William S. Cherry, III
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Represented By: Kenina J Lee
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Jordan Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Kenina J Lee
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Jordan Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Represented By: Kenina J Lee
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hillshire Brands Company
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Kenina J Lee
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carina Ventures LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah Lauren Jones
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Colleen Ann Harrison
Represented By: Jennifer R. Scullion
Represented By: Scott E. Gant
Represented By: Michael Scott Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burford Capital Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seeger & Weiss LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agri Stats Omega Holding Co. LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller, Canfield, Paddock & Stone, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hogan Lovells US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayer Brown LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greene Espel PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eimer Stahl LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenter Lipps LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dentons US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinson & Elkins LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vedder Price, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan, Price, Wall, Gray, Jones & Carlton, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venable LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falkenberg Ives LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manning Fulton & Skinner, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clausen Miller P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lipe, Lyons, Murphy, Nahrstadt & Pontikis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Raeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker & McKenzie LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Group Acquisition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Group Parent LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACR Foster Intermediate Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACR Group Foster Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACR III Foster Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACR IV Foster Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANV Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha K. Prestage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Prestage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Prestage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Prestage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Prestage Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Prestage Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hormel Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axinn, Veltrop, & Harkrider LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BB Kansas Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seaboard Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Farms of Indiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin R. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proskauer & Rose LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?