Robinson et al v. HP Inc.
Plaintiff: Renee Robinson, Richard Myers, Annette First, Casey Gaddy, Steven Gouisie, Robert Plunkett, Francois Steiger, James Ulrich, Gabriel Voiles, John Waudby and Lakesha Wells
Defendant: HP Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00164
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the parties' joint status report, #22 and adopts the proposed briefing schedule and page limits. Defendant's motion for leave to exceed page limitation, #14 , is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss is due by 3/11/2024 and should not exceed 40 pages. Plaintiffs' response is due by 4/8/2024 and should not exceed 40 pages. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by 4/29/2024 and should not exceed 25 pages. (rao, )
February 26, 2024 Filing 22 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Annette First, Casey Gaddy, Steven Gouisie, Richard Myers, Robert Plunkett, Renee Robinson, Francois Steiger, James Ulrich, Gabriel Voiles, John Waudby, Lakesha Wells (Raab, Stephen)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Ilissa S. Samplin's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant HP Inc. #17 , Samuel G. Liversidge's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant HP Inc. #18 , Sean Howell's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant HP Inc. #19 , and Rachel S. Brass's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant HP Inc. #20 , are granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/22/2024. Mailed notice. (jn, )
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21665267. (Brass, Rachel)
February 22, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21665197. (Howell, Sean)
February 22, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21665089. (Liversidge, Samuel)
February 22, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21664919. (Samplin, Ilissa)
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court is inclined to grant defendant's motion for leave to exceed page limitation given the complexity of the case, #14 , but the parties should first confer and exhaust efforts to reach agreement on the page limits for all forthcoming briefs. The parties should file by 2/26/2024 a status report with those agreed page limits. (rao, )
February 21, 2024 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HP Inc. (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
February 21, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant HP Inc. for leave to file excess pages for Motion to Dismiss (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
February 21, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc. by John K. Adams (Adams, John)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc. by Vanessa G. Jacobsen (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Arthur M. Stock's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #10 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/19/2024: Mailed notice. (rc, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21525800. (Stock, Arthur)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Peggy Wedgworth's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #8 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/12/2024. Mailed notice. (jn, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21517806. (Wedgworth, Peggy)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 3/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Jimmy W. Mintz's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #5 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/11/2024. Mailed notice. (jn, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/11/2024) (rao, ).
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number BILNDC-21511201. (Mintz, Jimmy)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robert Plunkett, Lakesha Wells, Annette First, Francois Steiger, Gabriel Voiles, Richard Myers, James Ulrich, Casey Gaddy, Renee Robinson, John Waudby, Steven Gouisie. HP Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2024, answer due 3/11/2024. (Raab, Stephen)
January 8, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (ksr, )
January 8, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ksr, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Annette First, Casey Gaddy, Steven Gouisie, Richard Myers, Robert Plunkett, Renee Robinson, Francois Steiger, James Ulrich, Gabriel Voiles, John Waudby, Lakesha Wells by Stephen J. Raab (Raab, Stephen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Raab, Stephen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Plunkett, Lakesha Wells, Annette First, Francois Steiger, Gabriel Voiles, Richard Myers, James Ulrich, Casey Gaddy, Renee Robinson, John Waudby, Steven Gouisie; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21494860.(Raab, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Robinson
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Myers
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette First
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Gaddy
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gouisie
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Plunkett
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Steiger
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ulrich
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Voiles
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Waudby
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakesha Wells
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Represented By: Jimmy W. Mintz
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Ilissa S Samplin
Represented By: John K. Adams
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Represented By: Samuel G. Liversidge
Represented By: Sean Howell
Represented By: Vanessa G. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?