Formtec, LLC et al v. Michael J. Morris et al
Plaintiff: Formtec, LLC and Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Michael J. Morris and Bennett Hartman LLP a/k/a Bennett, Hartman, Morris & Kaplan LLP, Bennett Hartman LLP, Michael J. Morris and Bennett, Hartman, Morris & Kaplan LLP
Case Number: 1:2024cv00520
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. (Walberg, Kim)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motions to appear pro hac vice #15 and #16 are granted. Mailed notice (lma, )
March 7, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21719918. (Levitt, Steven)
March 7, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21719731. (Gomberg, Trevor)
February 13, 2024 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bennett Hartman LLP (Johnson, Terry)
February 13, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bennett Hartman LLP, Michael J. Morris(Johnson, Terry)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file unredacted complaint under seal #7 is entered and continued to the initial status hearing set for 3/21/2024. At that time, the Court will hear from Defendants (assuming they have appeared) regarding their position on Plaintiff's request that the unredacted Complaint remain under seal. Mailed notice (lma, )
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. as to Bennett Hartman LLP on 1/24/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (Khuans, Nicollette)
January 29, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. as to Michael J. Morris on 1/24/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (Khuans, Nicollette)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 3/21/2024 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (lma, )
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. by Aaron T. Olejniczak (Olejniczak, Aaron)
January 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, )
January 22, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Michael J. Morris and Bennett Hartman LLP a/k/a Bennett, Hartman, Morris & Kaplan LLP (jcm)
January 22, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axk, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. to seal document sealed document #6 [unredacted] Complaint (Walberg, Kim)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. [unredacted] Complaint (Walberg, Kim)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. (Walberg, Kim)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. by Nicollette Liv Khuans (Khuans, Nicollette)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc. by Kim Renee Walberg (Walberg, Kim)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walberg, Kim)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Formtec, LLC, Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21548581.(Walberg, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Formtec, LLC et al v. Michael J. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Formtec, LLC
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: Kim Renee Walberg
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Represented By: Steven L. Levitt
Represented By: Trevor M. Gomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomahawk Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: Kim Renee Walberg
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Represented By: Steven L. Levitt
Represented By: Trevor M. Gomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Morris and Bennett Hartman LLP a/k/a Bennett, Hartman, Morris & Kaplan LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Hartman LLP
Represented By: Terry E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Morris
Represented By: Terry E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett, Hartman, Morris & Kaplan LLP
Represented By: Terry E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?