ERO Express, Inc. et al v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: ERO Express, Inc. and Super Ego Holding, LLC
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, Wilson Insurance and Investment Group, The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Translide LLC d/b/a Translide Freight, Herode Fleurant and Translide LLC doing business as Translide Freight
Case Number: 1:2024cv00708
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy L Maldonado
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: Plaintiffs have filed a stipulation to voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, Wilson Insurance and Investment Group, and the Littleton Group pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #19 . All claims against Defendants Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, Wilson Insurance and Investment Group, and the Littleton Group are dismissed. Plaintiffs' agreed motion to remand their remaining claims against Defendants Translide LLC and Herode Fleurant to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Dupage County, Illinois #20 is granted. Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants Translide LLC and Herode Fleurant are remanded to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Dupage County, Illinois forthwith. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company to remand (Agreed Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court in DuPage County) (Mintzer, Michael)
February 12, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION regarding notice of removal, #5 (Stipulation to Dismiss Counts I - VI of the Complaint at Law) (Mintzer, Michael)
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado:Plaintiffs have informed the Court's Courtroom Deputy via email that they are contemplating voluntarily dismissing the insurance defendants who removed this case to federal court and subsequently agreeing to remand the case back to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit DuPage County for proceedings against the remaining two defendants. By 02/12/24, plaintiffs may file a stipulation to voluntarily dismiss the insurance defendants and an agreed motion to remand, or, if they have not come to an agreement by that time, a joint status report updating the Court on how they would like to proceed. (ca, )
February 7, 2024 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ERO Express, Inc., Super Ego Holding, LLC by Tami J. Diamond (Diamond, Tami)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Littleton Group, A Davies Company (Mintzer, Michael)
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company (Mintzer, Michael)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Littleton Group, A Davies Company (DEFENDANT THE LITTLETON GROUP WESTERN DIVISION, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS III AND VI OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mintzer, Michael)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Defendant Trisura Specialty Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mintzer, Michael)
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 REFUND PROCESSED re REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $405.00, receipt no. AILNDC-21573435. (lw, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 04/25/24 10:00 a.m. in person in Courtroom 1925. By 04/18/24, the parties shall file a joint Initial Status Report that complies with the Court's standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. (ca, )
January 29, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 405.00, receipt no. AILNDC-21573435, regarding notice of removal, #1 EGO Express, Inc., et al v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Co., et al (Mintzer, Michael)
January 29, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
January 29, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Two). (lw, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 MAILED notice of removal letter to Luka Madzarac counsel for plaintiff. (nsf, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Christopher J Shannon (Amended Appearance for Christopher Shannon) (Shannon, Christopher)
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Michael Andrew Mintzer (Amended Appearance for Michael Mintzer) (Mintzer, Michael)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mintzer, Michael)
January 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit DuPage County, Illinois, case number (2023MR000744) filed by The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21573435. (Amended Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Mintzer, Michael)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Christopher J Shannon (Shannon, Christopher)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Michael Andrew Mintzer (Mintzer, Michael)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mintzer, Michael)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit DuPage County, Illinois, case number (2023MR000744) filed by The Littleton Group, A Davies Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BILNDC-21572138. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Mintzer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERO Express, Inc. et al v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERO Express, Inc.
Represented By: Tami J. Diamond
Represented By: Luka Madzarac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Ego Holding, LLC
Represented By: Tami J. Diamond
Represented By: Luka Madzarac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mintzer
Represented By: Christopher J Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Insurance and Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Littleton Group, A Davies Company
Represented By: Michael Andrew Mintzer
Represented By: Christopher J Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Translide LLC d/b/a Translide Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herode Fleurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Translide LLC doing business as Translide Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?