PLUMBERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 130, U.A. et al v. R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc.
Plaintiff: PLUMBERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 130, U.A., Local 130, U.A. Plumbers Welfare Fund, Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Training, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund, Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A. and Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A.
Defendant: R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00782
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 4/5/2024. Initial Status hearing is reset for 4/24/2024 at 9:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2024. Motion hearing set for 3/11/2024 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Mark McKay Trapp for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/11/2024 at 09:00 AM. (Trapp, Mark)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc. for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Trapp, Mark)
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc. by Mark McKay Trapp (Trapp, Mark)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund, Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A. by Andrew S Pigott (Pigott, Andrew)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund, Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A. by Gregory W. Hose (Hose, Gregory)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A., Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund as to R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc. on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024. (Festa, John)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/4/2024 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2024. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Virtual hearings must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund, Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A. (Festa, John)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund, Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A., Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A. by John Phillip Festa (Festa, John)
January 31, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc. (evw, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Festa, John)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A., PLUMBERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 130, U.A., Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Training, Local 130, U.A., Local 130, U.A. Plumbers Welfare Fund, Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21581397.(Festa, John)
January 30, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
January 30, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (emc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLUMBERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 130, U.A. et al v. R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLUMBERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 130, U.A.
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 130, U.A. Plumbers Welfare Fund
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Training, Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Retirement Savings Plan Fund, Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Andrew S Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Journeyman Plumbers' Local Union 130, U.A., Group Legal Services Plan Fund
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Andrew S Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers' Pension Fund, Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Andrew S Pigott
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers' Welfare Fund, Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Andrew S Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trust Fund for Apprentice and Journeyman Education and Training, Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Andrew S Pigott
Represented By: John Phillip Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Graham Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark McKay Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?