Kopulos v Pisaneschi et al
Plaintiff: Luke Kopulos
Defendant: Cook County Health, Cook County Goverment, Mark Pisaneschi, Cook County Health Foundation Not-for-Profit Illinois Corp; d/b/a John H. Stroger Hospital of Cook County and Cook County Government of Illinois doing business as Cook County Health
Case Number: 1:2024cv00926
Filed: February 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants Cook County and Pisanechi's motion to dismiss Counts II-VI of the complaint #26 is taken under advisement. The plaintiff's response is due 4/18/24; reply due 5/2/24. Mailed notice (air, )
March 27, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cook County Government of Illinois, Mark Pisaneschi Counts II-VI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Harvey, Colleen)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 ANSWER to amended complaint Count I by Cook County Government of Illinois(Harvey, Colleen)
March 18, 2024 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file the joint initial status report #23 is granted. The deadline for the joint initial status report and proposed case management schedule is extended to 4/10/24. Mailed notice (cn).
March 15, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos for extension of time Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Court's 2/21/2024 Minute Order (Mamalakis, Andreas)
March 8, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants Cook County Government of Illinois, Mark Pisaneschi's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #21 is granted. The deadline for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/27/24. Mailed notice (air, )
March 6, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Cook County Government of Illinois, Mark Pisaneschi for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Harvey, Colleen)
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 First AMENDED complaint by Luke Kopulos against All Defendants and terminating Cook County Health Foundation (Not-for-Profit Illinois Corp, d/b/a John H. Stroger Hospital of Cook County) (Barron, Susan)
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendant cook county foundation, amend the caption of the case, and amend the complaint #18 is granted. Defendant Cook County Health Foundation is dismissed from this case. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint with leave. Mailed notice (air, )
February 27, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos to amend/correct the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order, #2 Amended Complaint)(Barron, Susan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 3/18/24. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Kopulos as to Cook County Health Foundation on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (Barron, Susan)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Kopulos as to Mark Pisaneschi on 2/11/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Barron, Susan)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Kopulos as to Cook County Government on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (Barron, Susan)
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Gov on February 6, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County Government, Mark Pisaneschi by Colleen Marie Harvey (Harvey, Colleen)
February 13, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Gov on February 8, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Gov on February 6, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Health Foundation on February 6, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Gov on February 8, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Mark Pisansechi on February 11, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Complaint served on Cook County Gov on February 6, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 13, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Luke Kopulos regarding Affidavit of Special Service Processor served on Mark Pisansechi on February 11, 2024 (Barron, Susan)
February 10, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luke Kopulos by Andreas Mamalakis (Mamalakis, Andreas)
February 2, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
February 2, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Two). (lw, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barron, Susan)
February 1, 2024 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luke Kopulos by Susan S. Barron (Barron, Susan)
February 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Luke Kopulos; jury demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21596428.(Barron, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kopulos v Pisaneschi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Kopulos
Represented By: Susan S. Barron
Represented By: Andreas Mamalakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Goverment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pisaneschi
Represented By: Colleen Marie Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Health Foundation Not-for-Profit Illinois Corp; d/b/a John H. Stroger Hospital of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Government of Illinois doing business as Cook County Health
Represented By: Colleen Marie Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?