M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC et al
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation
Defendant: Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC, Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., Sergiu Tintiuc and PLD Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01113
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 Notice by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT TRUCK & TRAILER LEASING AVENUE LLC (Felton, Thadford)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #12 . The Court strikes the initial status date set for 4/10/2024 and resets it to 4/30/2024 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff should file any motion for entry of default judgment and notice it for presentment at the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Thadford A. Felton for presentment of before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/27/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Felton, Thadford)
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST For Default summons returned executed #9 , summons returned executed #8 , summons returned executed #7 , summons returned executed #11 Request to Clerk's Entry of Default (Felton, Thadford)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation as to Sergiu Tintiuc on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (Felton, Thadford)
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/10/2024 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/3/2024. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation as to Pigeon Freight Services, Inc. on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (Felton, Thadford)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation as to Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (Felton, Thadford)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation as to PLD Transport, Inc. on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024. (Felton, Thadford)
February 12, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants PLD Transport, Inc., Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., Sergiu Tintiuc, Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC (khg, )
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation by Onyinyechukwu Koplan Nwabuoku (Nwabuoku, Onyinyechukwu)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 STATEMENT by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation (Felton, Thadford)
February 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation (Felton, Thadford)
February 8, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Felton, Thadford)
February 8, 2024 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation by Thadford A. Felton (Felton, Thadford)
February 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21620000. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Felton, Thadford)
February 8, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (evw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Onyinyechukwu Koplan Nwabuoku
Represented By: Thadford A. Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigeon Freight Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergiu Tintiuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLD Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?