Ducere, LLC v. Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ducere, LLC
Defendant: Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Mustang Pipe Line, LLC and ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv01217
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendant Mustang Pipe Line, LLC to dismiss Corrected Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Counts I-V) (Phair, Ryan)
April 11, 2024 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #40 (Gurland, Carolyn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation to dismiss Complaint (Gurland, Carolyn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Mustang Pipe Line, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #38 (Phair, Ryan)
April 11, 2024 Filing 38 MOTION by Defendant Mustang Pipe Line, LLC to dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Counts I-IV) (Phair, Ryan)
April 11, 2024 Filing 37 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Gurland, Carolyn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation by Holly A. Tao (Tao, Holly)
April 11, 2024 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation by Kathryn J. Mims (Mims, Kathryn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation by David H Suggs (Suggs, David)
April 11, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant Mustang Pipe Line, LLC for leave to file excess pages in Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Phair, Ryan)
April 11, 2024 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. (Herbison, James)
March 26, 2024 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by Olga Pototskaya (Pototskaya, Olga)
March 21, 2024 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 5/13/2024 at 9:30 A.M. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice. (exr, )
March 21, 2024 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by Hannah Gallagher (Gallagher, Hannah)
March 6, 2024 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by Thomas Neuner (Neuner, Thomas)
March 6, 2024 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by Michael P Mayer (Mayer, Michael)
March 6, 2024 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by James Henry Blattner (Blattner, James)
March 6, 2024 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. by James Franklin Herbison (Herbison, James)
March 6, 2024 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to complaint #21 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 4/11/2024. Mailed notice. (exr, )
March 6, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #11 , #12 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #18 , #19 and #22 are granted. Mailed notice. (exr, )
March 6, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21714081. (Omoroghomwan, Vanessa)
March 5, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Mustang Pipe Line, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Complaint (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Phair)(Phair, Ryan)
March 5, 2024 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mustang Pipe Line, LLC (Phair, Ryan)
March 5, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21711475. (Teague, Molly)
March 5, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21711461. (Murray, Michael)
March 5, 2024 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mustang Pipe Line, LLC by Ryan Patrick Phair (Phair, Ryan)
March 5, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21710695. (Suggs, David)
March 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21710602. (Mims, Kathryn)
March 5, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21710365. (Tao, Holly)
March 5, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation by Carolyn Pelling Gurland (Gurland, Carolyn)
March 5, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21707466. (Hepner, Hammons)
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number BILNDC-21707375. (Diel, Ike)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice. (exr, )
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Ducere, LLC regarding Summons served on Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. on 02/20/2024 (Sharp, Rex)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Ducere, LLC regarding Summons served on ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on 02/15/2024 (Sharp, Rex)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Ducere, LLC regarding Summons served on Mustang Pipe Line, LLC on 02/15/2024 (Sharp, Rex)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21664254. (Kakazu, Nathan)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice. (exr, )
February 14, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mustang Pipe Line, LLC (jcc,)
February 13, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21633310. (Sharp, Rex)
February 13, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ducere, LLC by Rex A. Sharp (Sharp, Rex)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sharp, Rex)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ducere, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21633043.(Sharp, Rex)
February 13, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm)
February 13, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ducere, LLC v. Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ducere, LLC
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Lee Diel
Represented By: Nathan A Kakazu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: James Franklin Herbison
Represented By: Hannah Gallagher
Represented By: James Henry Blattner
Represented By: Michael P Mayer
Represented By: Olga Pototskaya
Represented By: Thomas Neuner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustang Pipe Line, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Murray
Represented By: Molly F. Teague
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Phair
Represented By: Vanessa Omoroghomwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Carolyn Pelling Gurland
Represented By: David H Suggs
Represented By: Holly A. Tao
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?