Arvest Bank v. Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arvest Bank
Defendant: Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC, Sergiu Tintiuc, Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., an Illinois corporation and Pigeon Freight Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01778
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Due to the Court's trial calendar, the in-person status hearing set for 5/10/2024 at 9:00 AM is reset to 8:45 AM (NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY). Mailed notice. (ym)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (King, Peter)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Sergiu Tintiuc on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (King, Peter)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Pigeon Freight Services, Inc. on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (King, Peter)
March 14, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., Sergiu Tintiuc, Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC (gmm, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Sergiu Tintiuc on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (King, Peter)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Pigeon Freight Services, Inc. on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (King, Peter)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvest Bank as to Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (King, Peter)
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arvest Bank by Peter M. King (King, Peter)
March 5, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (King, Peter)
March 5, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 5/10/2024 at 9:00 AM as an in-person hearing. Plaintiff(s) is directed to advise the defendant(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.1# requires at the time of filing a case, plaintiff's counsel, or if the case is filed pro se, the plaintiff shall file with the original papers a completed designation sheet (civil cover sheet). No civil cover sheet was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Arvest Bank is directed to file the #Civil Cover Sheet# within 14 days of this notification. Signed by the Executive Committee. (axk, )
March 4, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axk, )
March 4, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Arvest Bank (King, Peter)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified filed by Arvest Bank; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21698945. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint - Ex A - Truck & Trailer and Pigeon Freight Svcs. 2023 Annual Filing IL SoS, #2 Exhibit Complaint - Ex B - Note dtd 12-10-2021, #3 Exhibit Complaint - Ex C - Note dtd 12-17-2021, #4 Exhibit Complaint - Ex D - 2022 Freightliner NCxxxx, #5 Exhibit Complaint - Ex E - 2022 Freightliner NCxxxx, #6 Exhibit Complaint - Ex F - RTC Letter loan ending 6097, #7 Exhibit Complaint - Ex G - RTC Letter Loan ending 1131)(King, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arvest Bank v. Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvest Bank
Represented By: Peter M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck and Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergiu Tintiuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigeon Freight Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?