Segal v. Amadeus IT Group, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Segal
Defendant: Amadeus Group, S.A., Amadeus Hospitality Americas, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Accor S.A., Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC, Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Four Seasons Hotels Limited, Minor Hotel Group, Ltd., Omni Hotels Management Corp. dba Omni Hotels & Resorts, Loews Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Amadeus IT Group, S.A., Omni Hotels Management Corp. D/B/A Omni Hotels & Resorts, Amadeus Hospitality, Inc., Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Accor Management US Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Group, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC and Loews Hotels Holding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv01783
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. by Tina Hwa Joe (Joe, Tina)
April 26, 2024 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. by David Jarrett Arp (Arp, David)
April 26, 2024 Filing 76 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Amended) (Fardon, Zachary)
April 25, 2024 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Local Rule 3.2 requires the filing of a notice of affiliates before the court can rule on substantive matters. Defendant Six Continents has not yet filed a notice of affiliates that satisfies the local rule. However, all the appearing parties agree that defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint should be extended. Accordingly, the motion #52 is granted. By agreement of the parties who have appeared, any defendant that has been properly served or agrees to accept service within thirty (30) days after entry of this order will answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint #32 within sixty (60) days, i.e., on or before 6/24/2024. The parties' deadline to file a joint initial status report is extended to and including 7/8/2024.Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21896657. (Buyak, Caroline)
April 23, 2024 Filing 73 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Third Amended) (Litvack, Douglas)
April 23, 2024 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Local Rule 3.2 of this court requires disclosure of all affiliates, which is "defined as any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party." LR 3.2(a). Defendant Six Continents, Inc's, notice of affiliates #66 states that no individual or entity owns more than 10% of its stock. This notice of affiliates must be amended to disclose all affiliates meeting the 5% threshold set by Local Rule 3.2(a). Defendant Hyatt Hotels Co.'s second amended notice #59 of affiliates must be amended to indicate whether two disclosed affiliatesPrincipal Global Investors, LLC, and Wellington Management Group LLP-have any affiliates. Defendants' amended notice of affiliates are due on or before 4/26/2024. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 19, 2024 Filing 71 MOTION by Attorney Chad S. Hummel to withdraw as attorney for Accor Management US Inc.. No party information provided (Mahan, Carrie)
April 17, 2024 Filing 70 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Adkins, Tammy)
April 16, 2024 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21862390. (Newton, Emily)
April 16, 2024 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21862290. (Beck, Lohr)
April 16, 2024 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21862206. (Akhtar, Sarah)
April 15, 2024 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Six Continents Hotels, Inc. / Defendant Six Continents Hotels, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2024 Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Six Continents Hotels, Inc. by Zachary Thomas Fardon (Fardon, Zachary)
April 12, 2024 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Chad S. Hummel's motion to appear pro hac vice #60 on behalf of the defendant Accor Management US Inc. is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 12, 2024 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Eliot Fielding Turner's motion to appear pro hac vice #58 on behalf of the defendant Omni Hotels Management Corp. is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 12, 2024 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Amy P. Lally's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant Accor Management US Inc. #54 is granted. Attorney Benjamin M. Mundel's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant Accor Management US Inc. #55 is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 11, 2024 Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Six Continents Hotels, Inc. by Jeffrey S. Cashdan (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2024 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21846380. (Hummel, Chad)
April 11, 2024 Filing 59 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Second Amended) (Litvack, Douglas)
April 10, 2024 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21841080. (Turner, Eliot)
April 9, 2024 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Omni Hotels Management Corp. (Casmere, Edward)
April 9, 2024 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Omni Hotels Management Corp. by Edward M Casmere (Casmere, Edward)
April 9, 2024 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21834449. (Mundel, Benjamin)
April 9, 2024 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21834411. (Lally, Amy)
April 8, 2024 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Accor Management US Inc. (Mahan, Carrie)
April 8, 2024 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Amadeus Hospitality, Inc. for extension of time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Joint) (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 8, 2024 Filing 51 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amadeus Hospitality, Inc. (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 8, 2024 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amadeus Hospitality, Inc. by Amy Lynn Van Gelder (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 8, 2024 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Accor Management US Inc. by Sandra Nicole Booth (Booth, Sandra)
April 8, 2024 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Accor Management US Inc. by Carrie C. Mahan (Mahan, Carrie)
April 4, 2024 Filing 47 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Forrest, Katherine)
April 4, 2024 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. by Mari Grace (Grace, Mari)
April 4, 2024 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal)
April 4, 2024 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. by Tammy L. Adkins (Adkins, Tammy)
April 4, 2024 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Kristen C. Limarzi's motion to appear pro hac vice #40 on behalf of the defendants Marriott International, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, and The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC is granted. Attorney Melanie L. Katsur's motion to appear pro hac vice #41 on behalf of the defendants Marriott International, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, and The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 4, 2024 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Katherine B. Forrest's motion to appear pro hac vice #34 on behalf of the defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation is granted. Attorney Paul Brachman's motion to appear pro hac vice #35 on behalf of the defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation is granted. Attorney Matthew Robinson's motion to appear pro hac vice #36 on behalf of the defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 3, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21818392. (Katsur, Melanie)
April 3, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21818371. (Limarzi, Kristen)
April 3, 2024 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC by Jeffrey Michael Hansen (Hansen, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2024 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C., and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Kramer, Matthew)
April 3, 2024 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC by Matthew John Kramer (Kramer, Matthew)
April 3, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21815833. (Robinson, Matthew)
April 3, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21815786. (Brachman, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21815746. (Forrest, Katherine)
April 3, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. (vkm, )
April 1, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Accor Management US Inc., Amadeus Hospitality, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (jmv, )
April 1, 2024 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Amadeus IT Group, S.A., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Omni Hotels Management Corp., The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (jmv, )
March 29, 2024 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Four Seasons Hotels Limited on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2024 Filing 32 First AMENDED complaint by Ryan Segal against Accor S.A., Amadeus Hospitality Americas, Inc., Amadeus IT Group, S.A., Four Seasons Hotels Limited, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC, Loews Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Omni Hotels Management Corp. dba Omni Hotels & Resorts, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC (Berezney, Steven)
March 22, 2024 Filing 31 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Amended) (Litvack, Douglas)
March 22, 2024 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan Segal by David William Walchak (Walchak, David)
March 22, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Lindsay Harrison's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation #28 is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21765553. (Harrison, Lindsay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Douglas E. Litvack's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation #26 is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 19, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21762642. (Litvack, Douglas)
March 19, 2024 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Hyatt Hotels Corporation / Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates (Kastanek, Andrianna)
March 19, 2024 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation by Andrianna Deanne Kastanek (Kastanek, Andrianna)
March 18, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff's notice #21 of voluntary dismissal of his claims against defendant Minor Hotel Group, Ltd., is ineffective under binding Seventh Circuit precedent holding that the proper way to drop fewer than all claims or defendants is to amend the complaint. Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015) (citing Berthold Types Ltd. v. Adobe Sys. Inc., 242 F.3d 772, 777 (7th Cir. 2001). Because plaintiff has the right under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) to file an amended complaint as a matter of course without leave of court, plaintiff is instructed to file an amended complaint on or before 3/25/2024 dropping his claims against the dismissed defendant. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 15, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ryan Segal of Defendant Minor Hotel Group, Inc. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Omni Hotels Management Corp. dba Omni Hotels & Resorts on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Marriott International, Inc. on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Loews Corporation on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Hyatt Hotels Corporation on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Amadeus Hospitality Americas, Inc. on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Segal as to Amadeus IT Group, S.A. on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Claire Noelle Forde's motion to appear pro hac vice #8 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Attorney Vincent Briganti's motion to appear pro hac vice #11 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 6, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Accor S.A., Amadeus Hospitality Americas, Inc., Amadeus IT Group, S.A., Four Seasons Hotels Limited, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Loews Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Omni Hotels Management Corp. dba Omni Hotels & Resorts, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC (axa, )
March 6, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC (axa, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21710098. (Briganti, Vincent)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: An initial status report is due on or before May 8, 2024. Counsel and parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the pretrial procedures in Judge Gottschall's case management packet, which is available from the court's website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Please pay particular attention to the requirement to exchange initial disclosures within 14 days of the parties' initial discovery planning conference and the court's requirement that the parties are to explore settlement opportunities and identify areas of agreement prior to the filing of the first status report. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C) and 26(f)(2). If, by the due date of the scheduled status report, defendants have not been served, plaintiff should send an email to the chambers email account, chambers_gottschall@ilnd.uscourts.gov, to reset the status date. Counsel in cases removed from another court should follow these procedures to the extent applicable. See the order and Judge Gottschall's case management packet for further details. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/5/2024. Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Nicole Veno's motion to appear pro hac vice #6 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Attorney Christian Levis' motion to appear pro hac vice #7 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21708808. (Forde, Claire Noelle)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21708554. (Levis, Christian)
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21708066. (Veno, Nicole)
March 5, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan Segal by Pamela Ibrahim Yaacoub (Yaacoub, Pamela)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan Segal by Geoffrey Holmes Kozen (Kozen, Geoffrey)
March 4, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (evw, )
March 4, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan Segal by Steven M Berezney (Berezney, Steven)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berezney, Steven)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ryan Segal; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21699338.(Berezney, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segal v. Amadeus IT Group, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Segal
Represented By: Steven M Berezney
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Geoffrey Holmes Kozen
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Claire Noelle Forde
Represented By: David William Walchak
Represented By: Nicole Veno
Represented By: Pamela Ibrahim Yaacoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadeus Group, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadeus Hospitality Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hansen
Represented By: Matthew John Kramer
Represented By: Melanie L. Katsur
Represented By: Kristen C. Limarzi
Represented By: Sarah Akhtar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Douglas E. Litvack
Represented By: Lindsay Harrison
Represented By: Andrianna Deanne Kastanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Seasons Hotels Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minor Hotel Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corp. dba Omni Hotels & Resorts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loews Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Akhtar
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hansen
Represented By: Kristen C. Limarzi
Represented By: Matthew John Kramer
Represented By: Melanie L. Katsur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadeus IT Group, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corp. D/B/A Omni Hotels & Resorts
Represented By: Edward M Casmere
Represented By: Eliot Fielding Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadeus Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Represented By: Mari Grace
Represented By: Tammy L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Management US Inc.
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan
Represented By: Amy Pesapane Lally
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Chad Samuel Hummel
Represented By: Sandra Nicole Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Caroline Buyak
Represented By: Emily Shoemaker Newton
Represented By: Lohr Alexandria Beck
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Fardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Matthew John Kramer
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hansen
Represented By: Kristen C. Limarzi
Represented By: Melanie L. Katsur
Represented By: Sarah Akhtar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Robinson
Represented By: Paul Brachman
Represented By: Katherine B Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?