Reynoso v. Dana Container, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Reynoso
Defendant: Dana Container, Inc., Dana Transport, Inc. and Dana Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01964
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Daniel Reynoso. Dana Transport, Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Kreitman, Nicholas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Daniel Reynoso. Dana Container, Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Kreitman, Nicholas)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court reviewed the stipulations of dismissal (Dckt. No. #8 , #9 ), which are self-effectuating under Rule 41(a). Dana Companies LLC is dismissed without prejudice. The case remains pending against the other defendants. Mailed notice (jjr, )
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dana Container, Inc., Dana Transport, Inc. by John R. Hayes (Hayes, John)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dana Container, Inc., Dana Transport, Inc. by Beverly Pazon Alfon (Alfon, Beverly)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Amended to Clarify as to Defendant Dana Companies LLC only (Kreitman, Nicholas)
April 2, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kreitman, Nicholas)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: There is no need for a certificate of service for a court filing when all parties of record receive a copy through CM/ECF. Under the Local Rules, "[a] certificate of service is required only when service of a document filed on the Court's E-Filing system is made on a recipient who is not an E-Filer listed on the docket of the proceeding." See L.R. 5.5(a); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(B) ("No certificate of service is required when a paper is served by filing it with the court's electronic-filing system."). The Court handles service through CM/ECF. In effect, the CM/ECF header is the certificate of service. Save yourself the work, and the trouble. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by May 22, 2024. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Dana Companies, LLC d/b/a DCo LLC, c/o C T Corporation System, 4701 Cox Rd, Ste 285, Glen Allen, VA, 23060 on 03/08/2024 by Plaintiff Daniel Reynoso. Waiver of service due by 4/12/2024. (Kreitman, Nicholas)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Dana Transport, Inc., DALE HIRSCHFIELD, 13925 S KEELER AVENUE, CRESTWOOD, IL 60445 on 03/08/2024 by Plaintiff Daniel Reynoso. Waiver of service due by 4/12/2024. (Kreitman, Nicholas)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Dana Container, Inc., DALE HIRSCHFIELD, 13925 S KEELER AVENUE, CRESTWOOD, IL 60445 on 03/08/2024 by Plaintiff Daniel Reynoso. Waiver of service due by 4/12/2024. (Kreitman, Nicholas)
March 8, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (vkm, )
March 8, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (vkm, )
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kreitman, Nicholas)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Reynoso; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21722062.(Kreitman, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynoso v. Dana Container, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Reynoso
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Kreitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Container, Inc.
Represented By: Beverly Pazon Alfon
Represented By: John R. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Beverly Pazon Alfon
Represented By: John R. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?