Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. D.E.S. Painting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund and Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Defendant: D.E.S. Painting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02035
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by D.E.S. Painting, Inc.(Lyster, Todd)
April 29, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant D.E.S. Painting, Inc. by Todd C. Lyster (Lyster, Todd)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DEFAULT AND FOR AUDIT signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/25/2024: Plaintiffs' motion for entry of an order of default and for an audit #7 is granted. The telephonic status hearing set for 5/8/2024 is vacated and reset to 7/2/2024 at 9:05 AM, using call-in number 650-479-3207, access code 980-394-33. Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report on 6/25/2024. (mk)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund for order of Default and Audit Order (Egan, Paul)
April 22, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 5/1/2024, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 5/8/2024 at 9:00 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to D.E.S. Painting, Inc. on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. (Egan, Paul)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by James R. Anderson (Anderson, James)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Egan, Paul)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21731140. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Labor Agreement)(Egan, Paul)
March 11, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmv, )
March 11, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. D.E.S. Painting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.E.S. Painting, Inc.
Represented By: Todd C. Lyster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?