Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. v. Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
Defendant: ELK GROVE TRUCK SALES, INC, SINISA DROGELJEVIC, Red Star Trans, Inc., Ivan Durdevic, STAR LINES, LLC and Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02104
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time #20 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 6/3/2024. No appearance necessary on 5/14/2024. The in-person status hearing set for 5/14/2024 is stricken and reset to 6/13/2024 at 10:45 AM. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. Mailed notice. (ym)
May 3, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Desmond Patrick Curran for presentment of extension of time #20 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Curran, Desmond)
May 3, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Curran, Desmond)
April 30, 2024 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Ivan Durdevic. (jmv, )
April 29, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #12 is granted. Defendant to file a response to plaintiff's complaint by 5/3/2024. No appearance necessary on 4/30/2024. Mailed notice. (ym)
April 29, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. regarding Summons and Verified Complaint served on Sinisa Drogeljevic on 4/3/24 (Herman, Timothy)
April 29, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. regarding Summons and Verified Complaint served on Elk Grove Truck Sales on 3/15/24 (Herman, Timothy)
April 26, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
April 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. by John Patrick Killacky (Killacky, John)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Desmond Patrick Curran for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Curran, Desmond)
April 5, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Curran, Desmond)
April 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. (Curran, Desmond)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. by Desmond Patrick Curran (Curran, Desmond)
March 15, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ivan Durdevic, Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc., Red Star Trans, Inc., Sinisa Drogeljevic, Star Lines, LLC (jmv, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 5/14/2024 at 9:45 AM as an in-person hearing. Plaintiff(s) is directed to advise the defendant(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 Summons in a Civil Case Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 Summons in a Civil Case SINISA DROGELJEVIC by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 Summons in Civil Case - RED STAR TRANS, INC by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 Summons in Civil Case - IVAN DURDEVIC by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 Summons in Civil Case - Star Lines, LLC. by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21740446. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Herman, Timothy)
March 13, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (vkm, )
March 13, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (vkm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. v. Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELK GROVE TRUCK SALES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINISA DROGELJEVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Star Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Durdevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR LINES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elk Grove Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick Killacky
Represented By: Desmond Patrick Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?