Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc v. Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc
Defendant: Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC, Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., an Illinois corporation, Sergiu Tintiuc and Pigeon Freight Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02199
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 13 VERIFIED AMENDED complaint by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc against Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Loan Agreement_Redacted_Redacted, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Titles_Redacted, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Pigeon Freight Guaranty_Redacted, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Tintiuc Guaranty_Redacted, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Assignment_Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Demand Letter_Redacted)(Willer, Colette) Modified on 5/16/2024 (gcy, ).
May 11, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case was filed in federal court based on claimed diversity of citizenship. However, the complaint does not adequately describe the citizenship of either Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC or Sergiu Tintiuc. The citizenship of a limited liability company is that of all of its members, and if any member is itself an entity of some sort, citizenship must be traced all the way down. As for Tintiuc, the complaint describes his state of residence, but that is not necessarily the same as his state of citizenship. Plaintiff is given until 5/16/2024 to file an amended complaint curing these defects; if plaintiff does not do so, the Court will dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The status hearing set for 5/20/2024 will remain in place pending plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint. (mk)
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 STATUS Report Plaintiffs Initial Status Report by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc (Willer, Colette)
April 22, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 5/13/2024, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 5/20/2024 at 9:00 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc as to Sergiu Tintiuc on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024. (Willer, Colette)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to stay #7 is granted. Proceedings in this case with respect to defendant Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC are hereby stayed due to its filing of a bankruptcy petition. The case will proceed as to the remaining defendants. (mk)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc to stay Proceedings as to Defendant Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC only Pending Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willer, Colette)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc as to Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Willer, Colette)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc as to Pigeon Freight Services, Inc. on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Willer, Colette)
March 19, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., Sergiu Tintiuc, Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC (vkm, )
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc (Willer, Colette)
March 18, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Willer, Colette)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc by Colette Marie Willer (Willer, Colette)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified filed by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21753859. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Willer, Colette)
March 18, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (jmv, )
March 18, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc v. Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc
Represented By: Colette Marie Willer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck & Trailer Leasing Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigeon Freight Services, Inc., an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergiu Tintiuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigeon Freight Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?