Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, A8TWRKE0BTKWU, ASCUBL8DZD198, dibaowujinyou, GuangZhouYaNianShangMaoYouXianGongSi, haiyishenshangmaoxf, haomiaotianjinshangmaoyouxiangongsi, hefeiguyukundianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, hubeishenglifenglanbaihuodiana, huizhoushibaorongdayingerwanjuyongpinzhizaoyouxiangongsi, hungly, iangshidingta, izongyi, jinanchufujiajuyouxiangongsi, Kun Ming Mi Chen Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, Kun Ming Xin Zhou Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, kunmingchazengshangmaoyouxiangongsi, LYQ Tech, MANGRY1, mengchengxianjianyunzaishengziyuanhuishouyouxiangongsi, Pazhou Commercial.., QISHENGMAOYI, Ryphal, Saffi handmade west grand, shenzhenshiruishishangmaoyouxiangongsi, SHIOSHI, Sweety Smelling, WooYee US Store, xkwco, YangZhiMinkjhgfd, yichangshiyilingqujuezhenwangluokejigongzuoshi, yingyingkuajing, yuxiyanhuimaoyiyouxiangongsi, zhenghong321, zhongshanshiaoxiemaoyiyouxiangongsi, zhongshanyuncangfurengongyinglianguanliyouxiangongsi, ai808, fzctg7, googjle, hxas, leey1, sdwe889, tikok, anhiyif, auto-exterior23, autofun520, auto-parts5157, camelliajap0, cap-wholesale, changshengauto, diannan014, donwellauto, dqax_75, ebkang, enterautoparts, evilspiritsliveonearth, gouzoushu-62, gyuuehu, hk_1675, hkopauto, huk-98, leiizvj77, lifes825, mamie-7474, markertrad0, oyioywett, xinshuo178, xsy644, yakq-34, yangqing1990, yangx5691, yinshifen-74, zhanmaot_12, Au DiPart and dashigh
Case Number: 1:2024cv02247
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Filing 41 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #39 in the amount of $200,000 as to certain defendants (Halpern, Kahlia)
May 3, 2024 Filing 40 MAILED trademark closing report with certified copies of orders dated 5/02/24 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jj, )
May 2, 2024 Filing 39 DEFAULT Final Judgment Order Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/2/2024:Mailed notice(jcc,)
May 2, 2024 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 5/2/2024. No defendants appeared and no answers filed. Motion for entry of default and for default judgment #33 is granted. Enter order. Case closed. Mailed notice (jcc,)
May 2, 2024 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Andrew Daniel Burnham (Burnham, Andrew)
April 25, 2024 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing is set for 5/9/2024 is vacated. A telephone hearing as to the motion for entry of default and for default judgment #33 is set for 5/2/2024 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial (650) 479-3207, Access Code 180 815 7648. Throughout the hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 25, 2024 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for entry of default,, motion for default judgment, #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Halpern, Kahlia)
April 25, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Halpern, Kahlia)
April 11, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Halpern, Kahlia)
April 5, 2024 Filing 31 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/5/2024. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 4/5/2024. No one was present on behalf of defendants. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #26 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Dana A. Cizmadia #18 , and the TRO #23 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A telephone status hearing is set for 5/9/2024 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial (650) 479-3207, Access Code 180 815 7648. Throughout the hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 5, 2024 NEW PARTIES: A8TWRKE0BTKWU, ASCUBL8DZD198, dibaowujinyou, GuangZhouYaNianShangMaoYouXianGongSi, haiyishenshangmaoxf, haomiaotianjinshangmaoyouxiangongsi, hefeiguyukundianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, hubeishenglifenglanbaihuodiana, huizhoushibaorongdayingerwanjuyongpinzhizaoyouxiangongsi, hungly, iangshidingta, izongyi, jinanchufujiajuyouxiangongsi, Kun Ming Mi Chen Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, Kun Ming Xin Zhou Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, kunmingchazengshangmaoyouxiangongsi, LYQ Tech, MANGRY1, mengchengxianjianyunzaishengziyuanhuishouyouxiangongsi, Pazhou Commercial.., QISHENGMAOYI, Ryphal, Saffi handmade west grand, shenzhenshiruishishangmaoyouxiangongsi, SHIOSHI, Sweety Smelling, WooYee US Store, xkwco, YangZhiMinkjhgfd, yichangshiyilingqujuezhenwangluokejigongzuoshi, yingyingkuajing, yuxiyanhuimaoyiyouxiangongsi, zhenghong321, zhongshanshiaoxiemaoyiyouxiangongsi, zhongshanyuncangfurengongyinglianguanliyouxiangongsi, ai808, fzctg7, googjle, hxas, leey1, sdwe889, tikok, anhiyif, auto-exterior23, autofun520, auto-parts5157, camelliajap0, cap-wholesale, changshengauto, diannan014, donwellauto, dqax_75, ebkang, enterautoparts, evilspiritsliveonearth, gouzoushu-62, gyuuehu, hk_1675, hkopauto, huk-98, leiizvj77, lifes825, mamie-7474, markertrad0, oyioywett, xinshuo178, xsy644, yakq-34, yangqing1990, yangx5691, yinshifen-74, zhanmaot_12, Au DiPart and dashigh added to case caption. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 3, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for preliminary injunction #26 is set for 4/5/2024 at 9:15 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial (650) 479-3207, Access Code 180 815 7648. Throughout the hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 2, 2024 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 4/2/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner, #2 Exhibit A)(Juettner, Thomas)
April 2, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kahlia R. Halpern, #2 Exhibit 1)(Halpern, Kahlia)
April 2, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Halpern, Kahlia)
March 29, 2024 Filing 25 INJUNCTION BOND in the amount of $ 74,000.00 posted by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Document not scanned). (jj, )
March 22, 2024 Filing 24 Registry Deposit Information Form by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Halpern, Kahlia)
March 22, 2024 Filing 23 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/22/2024. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) Modified on 4/8/2024. (jj, ).
March 22, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Ex parte telephone conference held on 3/22/2024. Transcript is to remain sealed. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #14 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #19 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 22, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (jmv, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 (Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 18 EXHIBIT 3 to the Declaration of Dana A. Cizmadia Parts 1 - 5 by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-5 regarding declaration #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 3-5)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 4/8/2024. (jj, ).
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Dana A. Cizmadia regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jj, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 12 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jj, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #3 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 19, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
March 19, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Kahlia Roe Halpern (Halpern, Kahlia)
March 19, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
March 19, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 4/8/2024 . (jj, ).
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21761469. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
March 19, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (jmv, )
March 19, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Kahlia Roe Halpern
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A8TWRKE0BTKWU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCUBL8DZD198
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dibaowujinyou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GuangZhouYaNianShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haiyishenshangmaoxf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haomiaotianjinshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hefeiguyukundianzishangwuyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hubeishenglifenglanbaihuodiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huizhoushibaorongdayingerwanjuyongpinzhizaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hungly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iangshidingta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: izongyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jinanchufujiajuyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kun Ming Mi Chen Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kun Ming Xin Zhou Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kunmingchazengshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYQ Tech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANGRY1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mengchengxianjianyunzaishengziyuanhuishouyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pazhou Commercial..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QISHENGMAOYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryphal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saffi handmade west grand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzhenshiruishishangmaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIOSHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweety Smelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WooYee US Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xkwco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YangZhiMinkjhgfd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yichangshiyilingqujuezhenwangluokejigongzuoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yingyingkuajing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yuxiyanhuimaoyiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhenghong321
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhongshanshiaoxiemaoyiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhongshanyuncangfurengongyinglianguanliyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ai808
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fzctg7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: googjle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hxas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leey1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sdwe889
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tikok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anhiyif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: auto-exterior23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: autofun520
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: auto-parts5157
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: camelliajap0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cap-wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: changshengauto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: diannan014
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: donwellauto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dqax_75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ebkang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: enterautoparts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: evilspiritsliveonearth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gouzoushu-62
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gyuuehu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hk_1675
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hkopauto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huk-98
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leiizvj77
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lifes825
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mamie-7474
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: markertrad0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: oyioywett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xinshuo178
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xsy644
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yakq-34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yangqing1990
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yangx5691
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yinshifen-74
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhanmaot_12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Au DiPart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dashigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?