International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust v. Elmar Hotel Management, LLC
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust and International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399
Defendant: Elmar Hotel Management, LLC, Hanna Karcho, Remo Polselli, Allegiant Equities, LLC, Dolce Hotel Management, LLC, Resort America, LLC, South Sur Investments, LLC and West Coast Investment Fund, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv02250
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held on 5/16/2024. Parties report settlement has been reached in principle. Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 1:30 PM with the joint status report due by 6/13/2024. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed before the status hearing no appearance is required. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 15, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399 by Karsyn Marie Kratochvil (Kratochvil, Karsyn)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 STATUS Report by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399 (Blumthal, William)
April 18, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Allegiant Equities, LLC, Dolce Hotel Management, LLC, Hanna Karcho, Remo Polselli, Resort America, LLC, South Sur Investments, LLC, West Coast Investment Fund, LLC (jmv, )
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399 (Blumthal, William)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED complaint by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399 against Elmar Hotel Management, LLC, Hanna Karcho, Remo Polselli, Allegiant Equities, LLC, Dolce Hotel Management, LLC, Resort America, LLC, South Sur Investments, LLC, West Coast Investment Fund, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assumption Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - CBA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Collection Policy)(Blumthal, William)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 5/16/2024 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 5/9/2024. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust. Elmar Hotel Management, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Lozo, Ivana)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust by Ivana Lozo (Lozo, Ivana)
March 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust (Blumthal, William)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust by William M. Blumthal, Jr (Blumthal, William)
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Blumthal, William)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21761647. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assumption Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - CBA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Collection Policy)(Blumthal, William)
March 19, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (vkm, )
March 19, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (vkm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust v. Elmar Hotel Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 399 Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Ivana Lozo
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Karsyn Marie Kratochvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers of Chicago, Illinois and Vicinity Local No. 399
Represented By: Karsyn Marie Kratochvil
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmar Hotel Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Karcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remo Polselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolce Hotel Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sur Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Investment Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?