Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund et al v. Allacoustic Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund and Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund
Defendant: Allacoustic Solutions, LLC and Estrella Ayala
Case Number: 1:2024cv02291
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Default Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/15/2024. Mailed notice. (sxh, )
May 15, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Motion for order of default #11 is granted. The motion hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 is stricken.Mailed notice. (sxh, )
May 14, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel P. McAnally for presentment of motion for order, #11 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/21/2024 at 10:30 AM. (McAnally, Daniel)
May 14, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs only as to Estrella Ayala. (McAnally, Daniel)
May 14, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund for order of default. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McAnally, Daniel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 STATUS Report (Plaintiffs') by Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund (McAnally, Daniel)
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Initial status hearing set for 5/23/2024 is reset to 5/21/2024 at 10:20 a.m. Call in information remains the same. By 5/13/2024, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding service of Defendant Ayala. Mailed notice. (sxh, )
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Telephonic status hearing scheduled on 5/2/2024 is reset to 5/23/2024 at 10:05 a.m. Call-in information remains the same. Mailed notice. (sxh, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund as to Estrella Ayala. (McAnally, Daniel)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 5/2/2024 at 10:00 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684-8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel must type in their name when joining the call. At the initial hearing, parties shall be prepared to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution as well as a proposed discovery schedule. Mailed notice. (sxh, )
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund as to Allacoustic Solutions, LLC on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. (McAnally, Daniel)
March 21, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Allacoustic Solutions, LLC, Estrella Ayala (vkm, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund (McAnally, Daniel)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund by Daniel P. McAnally (McAnally, Daniel)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McAnally, Daniel)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Allacoustic Solutions, LLC and Estrella Ayala filed by Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund; n. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21766138.(McAnally, Daniel)
March 20, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmv, )
March 20, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund et al v. Allacoustic Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Health Fund
Represented By: Daniel P. McAnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel P. McAnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Supplemental Retirement Fund
Represented By: Daniel P. McAnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council Apprentice & Trainee Program Fund
Represented By: Daniel P. McAnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allacoustic Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?