Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds v. Solar Foundations LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds
Defendant: Solar Foundations LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv02372
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and order compelling the production of books and records for an audit #7 . The Court enters default against Defendant and orders Defendant to produce its books and records for an audit from October 17, 2023 through the present, no later than 5/31/2024. The Court strikes the status date set for 5/23/2024 and resets it to 8/6/2024 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiffs should file a status report indicating the status of the audit and any settlement discussions by 7/29/2024. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll- Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Michael Egan for presentment of motion for order #7 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/28/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Egan, Paul)
May 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds for order of Default and for Order Compelling the Production of Books and Records for an Audit (Egan, Paul)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 STATUS Report (Initial) by Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds (Egan, Paul)
April 12, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds as to Solar Foundations LLC on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Egan, Paul)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 5/23/2024 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 5/16/2024. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 25, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Solar Foundations LLC (vkm, )
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Egan, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21776701. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Assent)(Egan, Paul)
March 22, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (ksr, )
March 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ksr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds v. Solar Foundations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Foundations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?