Botts et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Jaylen Botts and Jennifer Smith
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03010
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 21 RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00936. (ph, )
April 16, 2024 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 59) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Panel and approved by Tiffaney D. Pete.. Signed on 4/15/2024. (clw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 19 Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-59) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Unassigned on 4/10/2024. (clw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ACTION re #12 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0. (aca)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 4/4/2024. Consent due by 4/25/2024 (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Agreed-to Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants, Abott Laboratories and Abott Laboratories, Inc. SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before April 29, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/3/2024. (dkb). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilee Mae Bramstedt on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 Letter to Attorney Levin regarding admission to SDIL. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Filing 10 Letter to Attorney Camassar regarding admission to SDIL. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer To MDL 3026 by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing All Parties to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to All Parties on 3/28/2024. Consent due by 4/18/2024. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-cv-936-NJR. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Noonan Witte on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Witte, Jamie) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24LA0258 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5349399), filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botts et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaylen Botts
Represented By: David Cates
Represented By: Jose Rojas
Represented By: Katie E St. John
Represented By: Paul Levin
Represented By: Scott D. Camassar
Represented By: Stephen M Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: David Cates
Represented By: Jose Rojas
Represented By: Katie E St. John
Represented By: Paul Levin
Represented By: Scott D. Camassar
Represented By: Stephen M Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?