Meilstrup et al v. G2 GAMING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jay Meilstrup and Yvonne Meilstrup
Defendant: G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP and Greg Carlin
Case Number: 1:2024cv03034
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 ELECTRONIC ACKNOWLEDGMENT : Case transferred from Illinois Northern has been opened in District of Delaware as case 1:24-cv-00585, filed 05/16/2024. (gcy, )
May 15, 2024 Filing 16 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Delaware the electronic record. (jn,)
May 15, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: On 4/16/2024, Defendants filed a motion #5 seeking to have this case transferred to the District of Delaware under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, in the alternative, dismissed under the doctrine of forum non conveniens. On 5/14/2024, Plaintiffs filed a document captioned "Plaintiffs' Consent to Transfer," in which they state that they "hereby consent to Defendants', G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP, and GREG CARLIN (collectively 'Defendants') request to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware." (Dkt. #14 .) Venue appears to be proper in the District of Delaware (see Dkt. #6 at 11), and the so-called "public interest factors" pertinent to transfer under 1404(a) do not compel this Court to reject the parties' agreement that the case should be transferred. Accordingly, Defendants' motion to transfer #5 is granted without objection, and the Clerk is ordered to transfer this case forthwith to the District of Delaware. All other deadlines are stricken or otherwise held in abeyance pending further order of the transferee District. Civil case terminated as to the docket of the Northern District of Illinois only. Mailed notice. (exr, )
May 14, 2024 Filing 14 Consent to Transfer by Jay Meilstrup (Mathias, Megan)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Defendants' Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP's Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint #12 is granted. Defendants Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP must answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 6/28/2024. Mailed notice. (exr, )
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP for extension of time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint (Morrison, David)
April 26, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer #5 : Plaintiff must respond on or before 5/14/2024 and Defendant must reply on or before 5/28/2024. Mailed notice. (exr, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GSGH HOLDCO, LP (Morrison, David)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by G2 GAMING, LLC (Morrison, David)
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 DECLARATION of DAVID E. MORRISON regarding motion to transfer case,, motion to dismiss, #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morrison, David)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 DECLARATION of GREG CARLIN regarding motion to transfer case,, motion to dismiss, #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Morrison, David)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP in support of motion to transfer case,, motion to dismiss, #5 (Morrison, David)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants G2 GAMING, LLC, Greg Carlin, GSGH HOLDCO, LP to transfer case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, Alternatively , MOTION by Defendants G2 GAMING, LLC, Greg Carlin, GSGH HOLDCO, LP to dismiss Pursuant to the Forum Non Coveniens Doctrine (Morrison, David)
April 16, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, )
April 16, 2024 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (daj, )
April 16, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (jmv, )
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP by Michael Lawrence Sullivan (Sullivan, Michael)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP by David E. Morrison (Morrison, David)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrison, David)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2024L003451) filed by Greg Carlin, G2 GAMING, LLC, GSGH HOLDCO, LP Filing fee $ 405, receipt number CILNDC-21858164. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morrison, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meilstrup et al v. G2 GAMING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Meilstrup
Represented By: Megan Mae Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Meilstrup
Represented By: Megan Mae Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 GAMING, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Sullivan
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSGH HOLDCO, LP
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Carlin
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Sullivan
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?