Carrasco et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Perla Carrasco and Emilio Carrasco, Jr.
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03047
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 18 RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-01036. (ph, )
April 16, 2024 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 60) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Panel and approved by Tiffaney D. Pete. Signed on 4/16/2024. (clw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 16, 2024 Filing 16 Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-60) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed on 4/16/2024. (clw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 11, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 5/3/2024 (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.'s (collectively "Abbott") Agreed-to Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Abbott SHALL respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before May 3, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/10/2024. (dkb). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 4/9/2024. Consent due by 4/30/2024. (jle) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 13 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilee Mae Bramstedt on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer to MDL 3026 by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 Letters to Attorney Camassar, Attorney Levin, and Attorney Reck, regarding admission to SDIL. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company on 4/4/2024. Consent due by 4/25/2024 (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-1036-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (aca) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Noonan Witte on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Witte, Jamie) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of the St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24LA0305 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5356405), filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/16/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrasco et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Carrasco
Represented By: David Cates
Represented By: Jose Rojas
Represented By: Katie E St. John
Represented By: Paul Levin
Represented By: Scott D. Camassar
Represented By: Stephen M Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Carrasco, Jr.
Represented By: Katie E St. John
Represented By: David Cates
Represented By: Jose Rojas
Represented By: Paul Levin
Represented By: Scott D. Camassar
Represented By: Stephen M Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?