Rybicki v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Rybicki
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv03214
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 MAILED Local Rule 83.15 to plaintiff. (nsf, )
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 RECEIVED from Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00136 (nsf,)
April 22, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (nsf, )
April 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (nsf, )
April 22, 2024 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to plaintiff. (nsf, )
April 18, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. (btg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/22/2024.]
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to Transfer for Improper Venue. See Order for details. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff at address listed on docket by Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/17/2024. (mne) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/22/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Rybicki. (nla) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/22/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by John Rybicki. (nla) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 4/22/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rybicki v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rybicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: AUSA - SSA
Represented By: Rachel J. Scherle
Represented By: SSA-Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?