Smith et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Dejuan Smith and Jennara Marrow
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc, MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03406
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the reassignment of the case, the status hearing of 05/31/2024 for Judge Chang is vacated. Emailed notice (mw, )
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer is presiding in MDL 3026 (22cv71, In Re: Abbott Laboratories, et al., Preterm Infant Nutrition Products Liability Litigation); and It further appearing that 24cv3406, Smith et al. v. Abbott Laboratories et al, was randomly assigned to Judge Edmond E. Chang and designated Magistrate Judge McShain falls within the scope of MDL 3026; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the Clerk is to reassign 24cv3406, Smith et al. v. Abbott Laboratories et al, to Rebecca R. Pallmeyer and Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez, and that they be designated as part of MDL 3026 and related to Master Docket Case 22cv71. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/24/24. (smb, )
May 24, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED from Northern District of Illinois; (1:24-cv-03406 Smith et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al / Direct file in ILND). In Re: Abbott Laboratories, Preterm Infant Nutrition Products Liability Litigation (MDL 3026) (smb, )
May 10, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 05/31/2024 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 05/23/2024. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendants have not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 15 RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-01105 (gcy)
April 26, 2024 Filing 14 CONDITION TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-61) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT. Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois.. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/26/2024. (clw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 13 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 6/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/22/2024. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACTION re #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 4/22/24. Consent due by 5/13/2024 (adh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilee Mae Bramstedt on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Bramstedt, Emilee) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Dejuan Smith, Jennara Marrow, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:24-cv-01105-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/7/2024 (aza) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Noonan Witte on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Witte, Jamie) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24LA00353 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CILSDC-5365411), filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anscombe, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/26/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejuan Smith
Represented By: David Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennara Marrow
Represented By: David Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Emilee Mae Bramstedt
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?