Anagram International, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Anagram International, LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto and The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2024cv10791
Filed: October 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Georgia N Alexakis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2024 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Motion hearing held on 12/5/24. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's renewed ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #70 is denied without prejudice to renewal. (ca, )
November 27, 2024 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #70 before Honorable Georgia N Alexakis on 12/5/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 76 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 75 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 74 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 73 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by Anagram International, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #70 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wiles Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 4, #7 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
November 27, 2024 Filing 70 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Renewed Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
November 22, 2024 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM by Anagram International, LLC Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
November 22, 2024 Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
November 22, 2024 Filing 67 AMENDED complaint by Anagram International, LLC against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 Filing 66 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anagram International, LLC Supplemental Notification of Affiliates (Hierl, Michael)
October 22, 2024 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Plaintiff's amended motion for leave to file under seal #10 and motion to exceed page limitation #11 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #7 is denied as moot. Upon review of the complaint, the Court sua sponte raises the propriety of joining 227 defendants #8 in a single action involving two trademark registrations and approximately 40 copyright registrations #1 . See, e.g., Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020). By 11/22/24, plaintiff shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the propriety of joinder in light of the principles described in Estee Lauder. Plaintiff may also want to review the Court's order in Bug Art Limited v. The Partnerships, 24 CV 7777, Dkt. 28, where the Court expressed its joinder-related concerns in cases of this size and type and also discussed its expectation that plaintiffs in such cases assist the Court in locating those portions of the record that support a plaintiff's joinder-related assertions. For example, in a case like this, where plaintiff has filed 42 individual PDFs, each one containing voluminous materials [Dkt. 14-55], the Court expects plaintiff to point it to the specific pages within those materials that support its joinder-related assertions. In the alternative, plaintiff has leave to file an amended complaint by 11/22/24 with a smaller subset of defendants along with its memorandum explaining specifically why each defendant is properly joined to all of the others. Estee Lauder, 334 F.R.D. at 189. The Court denies plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order without prejudice to renewal following resolution of these joinder-related concerns. No appearance is required on 10/24/24. (ca, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 64 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (jcc, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 63 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jcc, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 62 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jcc, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #11 , motion for temporary restraining order, #12 , motion to seal document #7 , motion to seal document #10 before Honorable Georgia N Alexakis on 10/24/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 60 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Anagram International, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 59 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 4 regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 58 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 3 regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 57 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 2 regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 56 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 part 1 regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 55 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 42 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 54 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 41 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 53 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 40 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 39 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 38 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 37 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 36 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 35 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 34 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 33 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 32 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 44 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 31 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 30 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 29 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 28 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 27 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 26 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 38 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 25 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 24 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 23 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 35 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 22 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 34 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 21 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 33 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 20 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 19 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 18 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 17 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 16 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 15 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 14 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 13 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 12 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 11 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 10 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Wiles Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Anagram International, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wiles Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #4 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC to seal document Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anagram International, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
October 18, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
October 18, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anagram International, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22626398. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 4)(Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (man, )
October 18, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (man, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anagram International, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anagram International, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?