Barker et al v. Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO

Plaintiff: Tammy Barker, Timothy Robert Barker and Melisa Merryman
Defendant: Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO
Case Number: 3:2008cv50015
Filed: January 21, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: McHenry
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2011 366 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 12/19/2011: Local 150's motion to reconsider 316 is granted. Local 150 is now granted summary judgment on all claims. All other pending motions 320 , 322 , 325 are denied as moot. This case is closed.[For further details see order.] Electronic notice(jat, )
March 11, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 3/11/2010:(pg, )
July 9, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 7/9/2009:(pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v. Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Barker
Represented By: Dean J. Polales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Robert Barker
Represented By: Dean J. Polales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisa Merryman
Represented By: Dean J. Polales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?