Sandholm v. The Dixon Public School District No. 170 et al

Plaintiff: Steve Sandholm
Defendant: The Dixon Public School District No. 170, Carolyn Brechon, James Hey, Thomas Balser and Woody Lenox
Case Number: 3:2009cv50119
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 3/10/2011: For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion for summary judgment 76 is granted on all counts. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff on all counts. All pending motions 64 are denied as moot. This case is terminated. [For further details see order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
September 24, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/24/2010: The court has inspected in camera the transcripts of the executive school board meeting held on September 17, 2008 and the deposition transcripts submitted by Plaintiff evidenc ing waivers of certain material previously found privileged by the court. Plaintiff's renewed motion to compel 67 is granted, in part. The court will return the transcripts to Defendants' attorney. Defendants' attorney is directed to preserve the transcripts for the duration of this litigation. [For further details see order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff.(jat, )
March 10, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 3/10/2010:(pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandholm v. The Dixon Public School District No. 170 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sandholm
Represented By: Erie DeNeal Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dixon Public School District No. 170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Brechon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Lenox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?