Precision Dose, Inc. v. United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)

Plaintiff: Precision Dose, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv50180
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: Winnebago
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/24/2015: For the foregoing reasons, the government's motion 186 for summary judgment is denied. Plaintiff's motion 183 for summary judgment is granted. The governme nt's motions to strike [219, 220, 221, 222] are denied. The government's objection 239 to the order 237 of the magistrate judge is denied. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $72,522 for the 2007 refund and $74,146 for the 2008 refund plus statutory interest on both. This case is hereby terminated. (See attached Statement-Opinion for detail) Mailed notice (ngm, )
February 28, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/28/2014: For the reasons stated below, defendants objection 126 to Magistrate Judge Mahoneys order 120 is denied. Mailed notice(ngm, )
December 11, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/11/2012:(pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Dose, Inc. v. United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Dose, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Reilly, II
Represented By: Keith C. Syfert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?