Tompkins v. Whiteside County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Tompkins
Defendant: Whiteside County Jail, Julie, John Doe, Kelly Willhelme and Tim Erickson
Case Number: 3:2015cv50206
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: Vermilion
Referring Judge: Iain D. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Frederick J. Kapala
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations: Before the court is a report and recommendation ("R&R") 70 by the magistrate judge that defendants' affirmative defense of failure to exhaust administrative remedies be rejected and this ac tion proceed to the merits of plaintiff's claims. After being afforded a sufficient opportunity, neither party has offered any objection to the R&R. Accordingly, there being no written objection to the R&R of the magistrate judge, see 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140, 149-50 (1985), and the court having reviewed the R&R, the court accepts the R&R and rejects defendants' affirmative defense of failure to exhaust administrative remedies and this action shall proceed to the merits of plaintiff's claims. Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 2/26/2018. Mailed notice (kms)
October 6, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation 65 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to subpoena witnesses 64 is also denied. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 10/6/2017. Mailed notice (jp, )
July 26, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 7/26/2017. Mailed notice (kms)
September 28, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has paid the $400.00 filing fee. On its own motion, the Court dismisses Defendants Whiteside County Jail and Tim Erickson. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to: (1) file Plaintiff's complaint 1 ; (2) issue summons for s ervice on Nurse Julie and Sheriff Willhelme; and (3) send Plaintiff two blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. The Court advises Plaintiff that a completed USM-285 (service) form i s required for each named Defendant. The U.S. Marshal will not attempt service on a Defendant unless and until the required forms are received. The U.S. Marshal is appointed to serve the Defendants. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 9/28/2015. Mailed notice (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tompkins v. Whiteside County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiteside County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Willhelme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?