Chambers v. Schmidts et al

Plaintiff: Roscoe Chambers
Defendant: Kris Schmidts, John Haaptman, State Of Illinois and Terry Costello
Case Number: 3:2018cv50242
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 5 MAILED etransferin83ltr to plaintiff. (nsf, )
July 12, 2018 4 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 4:18-cv-04123
July 10, 2018 Featured Case TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on July 10, 2018. On July 9, 2018, Plaintiff filed the instant suit against Whiteside County public officials and the State of Illinois about events that allegedly occurred in Whiteside County, Illinois. Plaintiff should have filed this case in the Northern District of Illinois, which embraces Whiteside County. Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the Northern District of Illinois. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) (authorizing a district court to transfer a case filed in the wrong district "if it be in the interest of justice"). (HR, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2018.]
July 9, 2018 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Roscoe Chambers. Responses due by 7/23/2018. (ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2018.]
July 9, 2018 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Roscoe Chambers. (Attachments: #1 motion)(ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2018.]
July 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roscoe Chambers. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 exhibits)(ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Schmidts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Schmidts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haaptman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roscoe Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?