Knack-Toms v. Meyer Njus Tanick, PA

Plaintiff: Karen E. Knack-Toms
Defendant: Meyer Njus Tanick, PA
Case Number: 3:2018cv50249
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: Lee
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2018 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status and motion hearing held on 9/13/2018. Briefing on the motion to dismiss #13 set as follows: Response due by 10/10/2018. Reply due by 10/19/2018. The parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by 11/19/2018 and hold off on discovery. Telephonic status hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 9:00 AM. By 11/30/2018 counsel shall review the Court's standing order on telephonic status hearings and provide direct-dial numbers to the Court's operations specialist who will initiate the call. (yxp, )
September 10, 2018 18 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Karen E. Knack-Toms (Volheim, Nathan)
September 10, 2018 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: By 9/11/2018 2:00 PM, the parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. As of 9/10/2018, only a Proposed Case Management Order #16 had been filed. The Court notes that defense attorney Elila Civelli's e-mail address on the docket is listed as inactive. Ms. Civelli is directed to update her contact information, and attorney Kathleen Klaus is directed to forward a copy of this order to Ms. Civelli. (yxp, )
September 5, 2018 16 PROPOSED Case Management Order by Karen E. Knack-Toms (Volheim, Nathan)
August 21, 2018 15 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Helen Klaus for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 9/13/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Klaus, Kathleen)
August 20, 2018 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The initial status hearing previously set for 9/13/2018 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:00 AM that same day to coincide with the presentment of the defendant's motion to dismiss #13 . Mailed notice (jp, )
August 20, 2018 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Meyer Njus Tanick, PA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Ms. Knack-Toms)(Klaus, Kathleen)
August 20, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Helen Klaus for presentment of before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 9/13/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Klaus, Kathleen)(refile and link to motion) Modified on 8/21/2018 (pg, ).
August 16, 2018 11 NOTICE by Meyer Njus Tanick, PA re Western Division ADR Notification #9 Notice of Certification Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution (Klaus, Kathleen)
August 7, 2018 10 NOTICE by Karen E. Knack-Toms of Certification Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution (Volheim, Nathan)
August 6, 2018 9 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
August 2, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen E. Knack-Toms as to Meyer Njus Tanick, PA on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Volheim, Nathan)
August 2, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Meyer Njus Tanick, PA by Elila Kate Civelli (Civelli, Elila)
August 2, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Meyer Njus Tanick, PA by Kathleen Helen Klaus (Klaus, Kathleen)
July 26, 2018 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 9/13/2018 at 9:00 AM. By 9/7/2018, the parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
July 24, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Meyer Njus Tanick, PA (jjr, )
July 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. (pg, )
July 19, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen E. Knack-Toms by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric)
July 19, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen E. Knack-Toms by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
July 19, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen E. Knack-Toms by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
July 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Karen E. Knack-Toms; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14718786. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knack-Toms v. Meyer Njus Tanick, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen E. Knack-Toms
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer Njus Tanick, PA
Represented By: Elila Kate Civelli
Represented By: Kathleen Helen Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?