Central Laborers Pension Fund et al v. RB Services & Hauling, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund, Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund and Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Defendant: Brian R. Sipes and RB Services & Hauling, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv50311
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status hearing held on 10/30/2018. The parties shall file a written report on the status of the case by 12/10/2018. (yxp, )
October 17, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The defendant's motion for leave to appear telephonically #13 is granted. Counsel for each side may appear telephonically for the initial status hearing on 10/30/2018 by providing direct-dial numbers for the hearing to the Court's operations specialist by 10/26/2018. Presentment of the motion set for 10/23/2018 is stricken. (yxp, )
October 17, 2018 14 (UNOPPOSED) NOTICE of Motion by Todd Abraham Miller for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #13 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 10/23/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Miller, Todd)
October 17, 2018 13 MOTION by Defendants RB Services & Hauling, LLC, Brian R. SipesUnopposed Motion To Appear Telephonically At Initial Status Hearing (Miller, Todd)
October 15, 2018 12 STATUS Report (Initial) by Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund (Toth, Richard)
October 12, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint by RB Services & Hauling, LLC, Brian R. Sipes(Miller, Todd)
October 9, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund as to Brian R. Sipes on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Toth, Richard)
October 4, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund by Storm Anthony Saponaro (Saponaro, Storm)
October 4, 2018 8 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
October 3, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants RB Services & Hauling, LLC, Brian R. Sipes by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen)
October 3, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants RB Services & Hauling, LLC, Brian R. Sipes by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan)
October 3, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants RB Services & Hauling, LLC, Brian R. Sipes by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd)
September 20, 2018 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 AM. By 10/24/2018, parties shall refer to Judge Johnston's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Brian R. Sipes (pj, )
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant RB Services & Hauling, LLC (pj, )
September 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. (jp, )
September 14, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund by Richard A. Toth (Toth, Richard)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Toth, Richard)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund, Central Laborers Annuity Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Central Laborers Welfare Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Central Laborers Pension Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14946441.(Toth, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Laborers Pension Fund et al v. RB Services & Hauling, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois Laborers Annuity Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers Annuity Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Region Organization Committee
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Illinois Laborers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Richard A. Toth
Represented By: Storm Anthony Saponaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Sipes
Represented By: Todd Abraham Miller
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Cahill
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Services & Hauling, LLC
Represented By: Todd Abraham Miller
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Cahill
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?