Cox v. Varga

Petitioner: Billy J. Cox
Respondent: John Varga
Case Number: 3:2018cv50327
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER from USCA case number 18-3332: We therefore DENY authorization and DISMISS Cox's application. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Authorization for a Successive Habeas Corpus Application) (jp, )
October 17, 2018 4 ENTERED JUDGMENT: Mailed notice(sb, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER : Petitioner has filed a previous 2254 petition in this court challenging the same convictions which was denied on 9/9/2015 (Case No. 14 C 50348). Therefore, the present petition is a second or successive habeas corpus application under 2254 that this court lacks jurisdiction to consider without authorization from the Seventh Circuit. See 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(A). Consequently, the petition #1 is dismissed and this case is closed. Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 10/12/2018. Mailed notice (jp, )
October 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
October 9, 2018 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Billie J. Cox against John Varga (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy J. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?